IN HB1344 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-3)
Status: Passed on April 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-29 - Public Law 135
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Nurse licensure compact. Specifies requirements for participation by the state in a multistate nurse licensure compact, including provisions concerning: (1) nurse qualifications, practice, and participation; (2) a compact commission; (3) interstate commission and state board of nursing authority and rulemaking; (4) a coordinated licensure information system; (5) oversight and enforcement; and (6) termination or withdrawal from the compact. Provides that an additional fee of $25 must be paid at the time of application and renewal of a license if the license is a multistate license.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Nurse licensure compact. Specifies requirements for participation by the state in a multistate nurse licensure compact, including provisions concerning: (1) nurse qualifications, practice, and participation; (2) a compact commission; (3) interstate commission and state board of nursing authority and rulemaking; (4) a coordinated licensure information system; (5) oversight and enforcement; and (6) termination or withdrawal from the compact. Provides that an additional fee of $25 must be paid at the time of application and renewal of a license if the license is a multistate license.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-17 - House - House Floor - (Y: 88 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 46 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - House - Third reading (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-29HousePublic Law 135
2019-04-29HouseSigned by the Governor
2019-04-29SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2019-04-24SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2019-04-24HouseSigned by the Speaker
2019-04-17HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 547: yeas 88, nays 4
2019-04-17HouseMotion to concur filed
2019-03-28SenateReturned to the House with amendments
2019-03-26SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 329: yeas 46, nays 2
2019-03-25SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2019-03-21SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2019-03-14SenateSenator Garten added as cosponsor
2019-03-11SenateSenator Randolph added as cosponsor
2019-02-27SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Health and Provider Services
2019-02-01HouseReferred to the Senate
2019-01-31HouseCosponsor: Senator Breaux
2019-01-31HouseSenate sponsors: Senators Zay, Charbonneau and Grooms
2019-01-31HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 77: yeas 96, nays 0
2019-01-28HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2019-01-24HouseRepresentative Bacon added as coauthor
2019-01-24HouseCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2019-01-14HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Statutory Committee on Interstate and International Cooperation
2019-01-14HouseCoauthored by Representatives Davisson and Shackleford
2019-01-14HouseAuthored by Representative Clere

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2019/bills/house/1344/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/4/d/a/04da4979/HB1344.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/a/5/7/3a57b97d/HB1344.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/1/6/9/9169d921/HB1344.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/d/9/a/9d9af418/HB1344.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/0/e/5/90e53623/HB1344.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/d/7/6/7d76361d/HB1344.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/8/7/5/a8756fc6/HB1344.04.ENRS.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/f/5/d/4f5d832b/HB1344.01.INTR.01.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/5/c/0/75c074e8/HB1344.77.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/7/5/4/2754741d/HB1344.02.COMH.01.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/1/3/8/01380176/HB1344.329.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/3/9/4/d3946053/HB1344.547.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback