IN HB1337 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 14-0)
Status: Passed on March 24 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-24 - Public Law 213
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Abortion. Requires the state department of health to develop certain information concerning perinatal hospice care. Requires physicians to provide information about perinatal hospice care to a pregnant woman who is considering an abortion because the unborn child has been diagnosed with a lethal fetal anomaly. Requires documentation as a matter of informed consent to an abortion that the pregnant woman received the required information about perinatal hospice care. Provides that the gender of the fetus and the medical indication by diagnosis code for the fetus and the mother must be reported on the pregnancy termination form for an early pre-viability

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Abortion. Requires the state department of health to develop certain information concerning perinatal hospice care. Requires physicians to provide information about perinatal hospice care to a pregnant woman who is considering an abortion because the unborn child has been diagnosed with a lethal fetal anomaly. Requires documentation as a matter of informed consent to an abortion that the pregnant woman received the required information about perinatal hospice care. Provides that the gender of the fetus and the medical indication by diagnosis code for the fetus and the mother must be reported on the pregnancy termination form for an early pre-viability

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-03-09 - House - House Floor - (Y: 69 N: 29 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-09 - House - House - House concurred in Senate amendments (Y: 60 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 37 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-29 - Senate - Senate - Amendment #3 (Stoops) failed (Y: 11 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-02-24 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-02 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 74 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-01-28 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-03-24HousePublic Law 213
2016-03-24HouseSigned by the Governor
2016-03-17SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2016-03-10SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2016-03-10HouseSigned by the Speaker
2016-03-09HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 414: yeas 60, nays 40
2016-03-09HouseMotion to concur filed
2016-03-02SenateReturned to the House with amendments
2016-03-01SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 295: yeas 37, nays 13
2016-02-29SenateSenator Steele added as cosponsor
2016-02-29SenateSenator Waltz added as cosponsor
2016-02-29SenateSenator Schneider added as cosponsor
2016-02-29SenateSenator Miller, Pete added as cosponsor
2016-02-29SenateSenator Kruse added as cosponsor
2016-02-29SenateSenator Tomes added as cosponsor
2016-02-29SenateAmendment #8 (Breaux) failed; voice vote
2016-02-29SenateAmendment #9 (Breaux) failed; voice vote
2016-02-29SenateAmendment #10 (Breaux) failed; voice vote
2016-02-29SenateAmendment #11 (Breaux) failed; voice vote
2016-02-29SenateAmendment #6 (Stoops) failed; voice vote
2016-02-29SenateAmendment #3 (Stoops) failed; Roll Call 237: yeas 11, nays 39
2016-02-29SenateAmendment #7 (Stoops) failed; voice vote
2016-02-29SenateAmendment #4 (Stoops) failed; voice vote
2016-02-29SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2016-02-25SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2016-02-18SenateSenator Banks added as cosponsor
2016-02-08SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Health & Provider Services
2016-02-08SenateSenator Brown L added as third sponsor
2016-02-08SenateSenator Holdman added as second sponsor
2016-02-03HouseReferred to the Senate
2016-02-02HouseSenate sponsor: Senator Young, M.
2016-02-02HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 153: yeas 74, nays 23
2016-02-01HouseAmendment #1 (Cox) prevailed; voice vote
2016-02-01HouseSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2016-01-28HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2016-01-12HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Public Policy
2016-01-12HouseCoauthored by Representatives Mayfield, Bacon and Judy
2016-01-12HouseAuthored by Representative Cox

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2016/bills/house/1337/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/d/d/0/add030e3/HB1337.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/5/4/f/554fc7d6/HB1337.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/1/6/6/7166cfb4/HB1337.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/1/a/8/01a8b9ae/HB1337.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/8/3/3/9833364f/HB1337.03.ENGH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/9/7/7/a9778915/HB1337.03.ENGH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/1/9/8/a198b5c0/HB1337.04.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/a/a/5/1aa56579/HB1337.04.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/1/b/5/51b52d50/HB1337.05.ENRS.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/8/2/c/f82ca5b3/HB1337.01.INTR.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/5/d/a/55da87c5/HB1337.153.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/5/d/3/95d387ef/HB1337.03.ENGH.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/c/4/5/1c454ada/HB1337.237.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/a/4/7/6a4790b6/HB1337.295.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/1/8/a/d18a1af5/HB1337.414.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/c/c/4/8cc4706e/HB1337.413.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback