IN HB1337 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-25 - Reread third time: defeated Roll Call 247: yeas 32, nays 62
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-25 - Reread third time: defeated Roll Call 247: yeas 32, nays 62
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
School accountability and turnaround academies.
Title
School accountability and turnaround academies.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-02-25 - House - House - Third reading: recommitted to Committee of One, amended adopted (Y: 32 N: 62 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-25 | House | Reread third time: defeated Roll Call 247: yeas 32, nays 62 |
2013-02-25 | House | Amendment 4 ( Behning) and prevailed; voice vote |
2013-02-25 | House | Third reading: recommitted to Committee of One, amended; vote on the bill, as amended, postponed |
2013-02-21 | House | Amendment 2 (Behning), prevailed; voice vote |
2013-02-21 | House | Amendment 3 (Behning), prevailed; voice vote |
2013-02-21 | House | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2013-02-19 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2013-01-17 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Education |
2013-01-17 | House | Authored by Representative Behning |