IN HB1336 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 23 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-23 - Public Law 170
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Business entities; series limited liability. Makes various changes to the business and other association law, including the following: (1) Requires that an application to reserve or renew a reservation of a name and a notice of transfer of a reserved name must be filed with the secretary of state electronically and makes the corresponding changes to the fees. (2) Establishes requirements concerning plans or filed documents that include terms that are dependent on facts objectively ascertainable outside the plan or filed document for limited liability partnerships, limited partnerships, nonprofit corporations, and limited liability companies. (3) Provides that the name of

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Business entities; series limited liability. Makes various changes to the business and other association law, including the following: (1) Requires that an application to reserve or renew a reservation of a name and a notice of transfer of a reserved name must be filed with the secretary of state electronically and makes the corresponding changes to the fees. (2) Establishes requirements concerning plans or filed documents that include terms that are dependent on facts objectively ascertainable outside the plan or filed document for limited liability partnerships, limited partnerships, nonprofit corporations, and limited liability companies. (3) Provides that the name of

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-03-01 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-22 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-01 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-01-25 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-03-23HousePublic Law 170
2016-03-23HouseSigned by the Governor
2016-03-16SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2016-03-10SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2016-03-09HouseSigned by the Speaker
2016-03-03SenateReturned to the House without amendments
2016-03-01SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 294: yeas 50, nays 0
2016-02-25SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2016-02-22SenateSenator Randolph added as cosponsor
2016-02-22SenateCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2016-02-08SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Civil Law
2016-02-02HouseReferred to the Senate
2016-02-01HouseSenate sponsors: Senators Bray, Holdman, Broden
2016-02-01HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 96: yeas 94, nays 0
2016-01-28HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2016-01-25HouseRepresentative Richardson added as coauthor
2016-01-25HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2016-01-21HouseRepresentative DeLaney added as coauthor
2016-01-12HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary
2016-01-12HouseAuthored by Representative Cox

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2016/bills/house/1336/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/6/7/0/7670bf69/HB1336.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/0/9/c/409c60bb/HB1336.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/5/f/7/f5f7af27/HB1336.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/c/a/3/cca3cd5a/HB1336.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/f/b/0/afb0a79f/HB1336.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/8/a/c/08ac0bf9/HB1336.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/5/e/0/55e0ea0c/HB1336.04.ENRS.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/3/2/b/732bac88/HB1336.01.INTR.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/f/9/0/2f90532a/HB1336.96.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/2/a/3/72a389b8/HB1336.02.COMH.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/e/0/a/4e0a55bb/HB1336.294.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback