IN HB1331 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-27 - Representatives Morris and Moed added as coauthors
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-27 - Representatives Morris and Moed added as coauthors
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Ticket sales. Provides that a ticket issuer shall not issue a ticket exclusively through a delivery method that substantially prevents the ticket purchaser from lawfully transferring or reselling the ticket through certain methods. Provides that a person shall not be discriminated against or denied admission to any event in certain instances. Provides that a web site operator may not use an Internet domain name or any subdomain in a ticket web site's URL that contains certain names. Provides that using an Internet domain name or any subdomain that contains certain names is a deceptive act.
Title
Ticket sales.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-22 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-27 | House | Representatives Morris and Moed added as coauthors |
2020-01-23 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2020-01-16 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Commerce, Small Business and Economic Development |
2020-01-16 | House | Authored by Representative Carbaugh |