IN HB1331 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on April 16 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-04-22 - Senate advisors appointed: Rogers and Lanane
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Homeowners associations. Provides that, subject to certain specified exceptions, a homeowners association may not: (1) prohibit the owner of a dwelling unit from installing a solar energy system; (2) impose unreasonable limitations on the owner's ability to install or use a solar energy system; or (3) require the removal of a solar energy system that has been installed. Provides, however, that a homeowners association may require: (1) compliance with screening requirements imposed by the homeowners association; and (2) preapproval of the location of a solar energy system and of the manner in which the solar energy system is installed. Applies only to rules, covenants, declarations of restrictions, and other governing documents adopted or amended by a homeowners association after June 30, 2019. Provides that if a party to a dispute involving a homeowners association requests mediation, mediation is mandatory. Provides that if neither party requests mediation, or if mediation is unsuccessful, a claimant may begin legal proceedings. Requires a mediation to be conducted in compliance with the Indiana supreme court rules for alternative dispute resolution. Makes corresponding amendments to the provisions regarding grievance resolutions involving condominium associations.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Homeowners associations. Provides that, subject to certain specified exceptions, a homeowners association may not: (1) prohibit the owner of a dwelling unit from installing a solar energy system; (2) impose unreasonable limitations on the owner's ability to install or use a solar energy system; or (3) require the removal of a solar energy system that has been installed. Provides, however, that a homeowners association may require: (1) compliance with screening requirements imposed by the homeowners association; and (2) preapproval of the location of a solar energy system and of the manner in which the solar energy system is installed. Applies only to rules, covenants, declarations of restrictions, and other governing documents adopted or amended by a homeowners association after June 30, 2019. Provides that if a party to a dispute involving a homeowners association requests mediation, mediation is mandatory. Provides that if neither party requests mediation, or if mediation is unsuccessful, a claimant may begin legal proceedings. Requires a mediation to be conducted in compliance with the Indiana supreme court rules for alternative dispute resolution. Makes corresponding amendments to the provisions regarding grievance resolutions involving condominium associations.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-16 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 31 N: 14 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - House - Third reading (Y: 90 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-22SenateSenate advisors appointed: Rogers and Lanane
2019-04-22SenateSenate conferees appointed: Freeman and Taylor G
2019-04-22HouseRepresentative Bacon added as advisor
2019-04-18HouseHouse advisors appointed: DeVon, Morrison, Pressel and Pierce
2019-04-18HouseHouse conferees appointed: Speedy and Hamilton
2019-04-18HouseHouse dissented from Senate amendments
2019-04-18HouseMotion to dissent filed
2019-04-16SenateReturned to the House with amendments
2019-04-16SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 486: yeas 31, nays 14
2019-04-11SenateAmendment #4 (Rogers) prevailed; voice vote
2019-04-11SenateAmendment #3 (Rogers) prevailed; voice vote
2019-04-11SenateAmendment #2 (Rogers) prevailed; voice vote
2019-04-11SenateAmendment #5 (Sandlin) prevailed; voice vote
2019-04-11SenateSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2019-04-09SenateSenator Randolph added as cosponsor
2019-04-09SenateSenator Stoops added as cosponsor
2019-04-04SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2019-03-04SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary
2019-02-20HouseReferred to the Senate
2019-02-19HouseSenate sponsors: Senators Freeman and Merritt
2019-02-19HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 223: yeas 90, nays 6
2019-02-18HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2019-02-14HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2019-02-04HouseRepresentatives Torr and Pierce added as coauthors
2019-01-29HouseRepresentative Hamilton added as coauthor
2019-01-14HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Utilities, Energy and Telecommunications
2019-01-14HouseAuthored by Representative Speedy

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2019/bills/house/1331/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/a/b/7/9ab729d8/HB1331.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/1/8/6/f1867a56/HB1331.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/8/4/7/28479473/HB1331.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/3/1/a/a31a223e/HB1331.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/7/0/b/d70b4726/HB1331.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/f/1/c/7f1c158b/HB1331.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/7/b/b/67bb8942/HB1331.04.ENGS.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/e/f/4/7ef4b026/HB1331.01.INTR.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/1/6/8/4168d821/HB1331.223.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/c/9/7/ec976332/HB1331.02.COMH.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/1/8/e/918e0f8d/HB1331.486.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback