IN HB1330 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on May 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-01 - Public Law 172
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Disposal of abandoned or derelict aircraft. Specifies that a "person" includes a political subdivision for purposes of the statute concerning liens for the repair, storage, servicing, or furnishing of supplies for certain motor vehicles, airplanes, machinery, and equipment. Establishes a procedure for the disposal and removal of an abandoned aircraft or a derelict aircraft from the premises of: (1) a public-use airport; or (2) a fixed-base operator at a public-use airport.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Disposal of abandoned or derelict aircraft. Specifies that a "person" includes a political subdivision for purposes of the statute concerning liens for the repair, storage, servicing, or furnishing of supplies for certain motor vehicles, airplanes, machinery, and equipment. Establishes a procedure for the disposal and removal of an abandoned aircraft or a derelict aircraft from the premises of: (1) a public-use airport; or (2) a fixed-base operator at a public-use airport.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-16 - House - House - House concurred in Senate amendments (Y: 80 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-04-01 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - House - Third reading (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-01HousePublic Law 172
2019-05-01HouseSigned by the Governor
2019-04-29SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2019-04-18SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2019-04-18HouseSigned by the Speaker
2019-04-16HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 538: yeas 80, nays 12
2019-04-10HouseMotion to concur filed
2019-04-02SenateReturned to the House with amendments
2019-04-01SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 355: yeas 47, nays 0
2019-03-28SenateSenator Randolph added as cosponsor
2019-03-28SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2019-03-26SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2019-03-04SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Homeland Security and Transportation
2019-02-20HouseReferred to the Senate
2019-02-19HouseSenate sponsors: Senators Doriot and Bohacek
2019-02-19HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 222: yeas 96, nays 0
2019-02-18HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2019-02-14HouseRepresentatives Frye and Pressel added as coauthors
2019-02-14HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2019-01-14HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Roads and Transportation
2019-01-14HouseAuthored by Representative Speedy

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2019/bills/house/1330/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/0/b/6/d0b647c8/HB1330.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/3/a/5/e3a5bcf2/HB1330.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/1/5/2/5152f426/HB1330.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/c/6/5/dc65b59e/HB1330.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/8/0/d/180dc045/HB1330.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/5/5/8/5558a3a8/HB1330.04.ENRS.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/a/6/a/aa6a4ef1/HB1330.01.INTR.01.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/d/0/3/2d03a2d8/HB1330.222.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/a/6/d/ca6d6242/HB1330.02.COMH.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/5/1/8/3518dd78/HB1330.355.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/1/b/0/b1b0d638/HB1330.538.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback