IN HB1328 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 13 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-15 - Representative Welch added as coauthor
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-15 - Representative Welch added as coauthor
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Allows the state student assistance commission (SSACI) to transfer funds between freedom of choice grants and higher education awards. Allows SSACI recipients to use up to two semesters worth of aid on summer classes beginning July 1, 2013. Provide that assistance programs may be provided only for undergraduate courses and for no more than eight semesters. Requires private universities that accept SSACI funds to submit specified information to the commission on higher education. Beginning July 1, 2013, changes the minority teacher, special education services, and nursing scholarship programs from an up-front grant programs to reimbursement programs using income tax credits, and provides that the tax credits may be claimed after the academic program is completed. Limits the total credits to $400,000 per state fiscal year. Limits the annual credit amount so that full reimbursement is recouped during the same period as the participant is fulfilling the program's work requirements. Requires individuals participating as students in the minority teacher, special education services, and nursing scholarship tax credit programs after June 30, 2013, to maintain the greater of the grade point average required by their educational institution or 2.5 on a 4.0 scale. Changes the eligibility requirements for the 21st century scholars program for individuals who first enroll in the program after June 30, 2011, to: (1) allow only 7th and 8th graders to enroll in the program; and (2) remove the free and reduced lunch criteria and replace it with the annual family income standard used for the free (not reduced price) lunch program. Requires SSACI to prescribe an application form and approve 21st century scholar applications after June 30, 2011. Beginning in July 2012, requires
Title
SSACI assistance.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-15 | Representative Welch added as coauthor | |
2011-01-13 | First reading: referred to Committee on Education | |
2011-01-13 | Authored by Representative Dermody |
Indiana State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.in.gov/apps/lsa/session/billwatch/billinfo?year=2011&session=1&request=getBill&doctype=HB&docno=1328 |
Text | http://www.in.gov/legislative/bills/2011/IN/IN1328.1.html |