IN HB1324 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 25 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-25 - Effective 07/01/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 25 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-25 - Effective 07/01/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Permits a county to sell a vacant parcel acquired by the county in a tax sale to the owner of a contiguous residential parcel for $1 if the contiguous parcel is entitled to the standard property tax deduction. Allows the county to establish criteria to identify vacant parcels eligible for sale. Establishes procedures for conduct of the sale, transfer of the vacant parcel, and consolidation of the vacant parcel with the contiguous parcel. Provides that the consolidated parcel is entitled to an exemption from property taxation in the amount of the assessed value of the vacant parcel at the time of consolidation until the earlier of the following: (1) the next transfer of title after the consolidation; or (2) five years after the transfer of the title to the successful applicant. Provides that a tax deed for real property sold in a tax sale: (1) does not operate to extinguish an easement recorded before the tax sale, regardless of whether the easement was taxed separately from the real property; and (2) conveys title subject to all easements recorded before the date of the tax sale.
Title
Disposal of vacant lots in tax sale process.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-25 | Effective 07/01/2010 | |
2010-03-25 | Public Law 98 | |
2010-03-18 | Signed by the Governor | |
2010-03-15 | Signed by the President of the Senate | |
2010-03-12 | Signed by the President Pro Tempore | |
2010-03-11 | Signed by the Speaker | |
2010-03-04 | House reconsidered and concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 305: Yeas 82, Nays 3 | |
2010-03-02 | Senate advisors appointed: Walker, Breaux and Leising | |
2010-03-02 | Senate conferees appointed: Wyss and Rogers | |
2010-03-01 | House advisors appointed: Sullivan, Moses, Foley and Saunders | |
2010-03-01 | House conferees appointed: GiaQuinta and Neese | |
2010-03-01 | House dissented from Senate amendments | |
2010-02-23 | Returned to the House with amendments | |
2010-02-23 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 212: Yeas 50 and Nays 0 | |
2010-02-22 | Amendment 2 (Lawson C), prevailed; | |
2010-02-22 | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed | |
2010-02-18 | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted | |
2010-02-15 | Senators Breaux and Taylor added as cosponsors | |
2010-02-09 | Representatives Eberhart and Moses added as coauthors | |
2010-02-08 | First reading: referred to Committee on Local Government | |
2010-02-02 | Senate sponsors: Senators Wyss and Rogers | |
2010-02-02 | Referred to the Senate | |
2010-02-02 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 111: Yeas 88, Nays 7 | |
2010-02-01 | Amendment 1 (Pryor), prevailed; Voice Vote | |
2010-02-01 | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed | |
2010-01-28 | Committee report: do pass, adopted | |
2010-01-25 | Representative Sullivan added as coauthor | |
2010-01-13 | First reading: referred to Committee on Local Government | |
2010-01-13 | Authored by Representative GiaQuinta |