IN HB1321 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-13 - Public Law 276
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-13 - Public Law 276
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Insurance matters.
Title
Insurance matters.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-16 - House - House - House concurred in Senate amendments (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2013-04-04 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-02-19 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-04-04 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-02-19 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-13 | House | Public Law 276 |
2013-05-11 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2013-04-29 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2013-04-26 | House | Joint Rule 20 technical correction adopted by the House |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Joint Rule 20 technical correction adopted by the Senate |
2013-04-16 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 504: yeas 89, nays 0 |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as cosponsor |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Returned to the House with amendments |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 376: yeas 48 and nays 0 |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Amendment 1 (Holdman), prevailed; voice vote |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Senator Mrvan added as cosponsor |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2013-02-25 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Insurance |
2013-02-19 | House | Representative DeLaney added as coauthor |
2013-02-19 | House | Senate sponsor: Senator Paul |
2013-02-19 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2013-02-19 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 154: yeas 95, nays 0 |
2013-02-18 | House | Amendment 2 (Lehman), prevailed; voice vote |
2013-02-18 | House | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2013-02-11 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2013-01-17 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Insurance |
2013-01-17 | House | Authored by Representative Lehman |