IN HB1318 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-3)
Status: Passed on March 10 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-10 - Public Law 81
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-3)
Status: Passed on March 10 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-10 - Public Law 81
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Child care provided by a school corporation. Allows a child care program that: (1) is operated by a public or private school; and (2) provides day care on the school premises for children of students or employees of schools in the school corporation in which the public or private school is located; to be exempted from licensure as a child care facility. Provides that: (1) a preschool program that is operated by a public or private school; and (2) either or both: (A) a child care program that is located in the public or private secondary school and provides child care for children of employees or students of the public or private secondary school; and (B) a latch key program; are exempt from licensure as child care facilities if located in the same public or private school building. Provides that for purposes of determining the child to staff ratio and group size requirements for a child care program that: (1) enrolls children at least two and one-half years of age, but not more than six years of age; and (2) is validated as a Montessori program by the United Montessori Schools of Indiana; the division of family resources of the family and social services administration shall use the average age of the children in the group as of January 1 of the school year.
Title
Child care provided by a school corporation.
Sponsors
Rep. Craig Snow [R] | Rep. Julie Olthoff [R] | Rep. Steve Bartels [R] | Rep. Carolyn Jackson [D] |
Sen. Stacey Donato [R] | Sen. John Crane [R] | Sen. J.D. Ford [D] | Sen. Fady Qaddoura [D] |
Sen. Linda Rogers [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-01 - House - House - House concurred in Senate amendments (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-01-31 - House - House Floor - (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-01-20 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-01-31 - House - House Floor - (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-01-20 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-10 | House | Public Law 81 |
2022-03-10 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2022-03-04 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2022-03-01 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 318: yeas 92, nays 0 |
2022-02-28 | House | Motion to concur filed |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Returned to the House with amendments |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Senator Rogers added as cosponsor |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Senators Ford J.D. and Qaddoura added as cosponsors |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Senator Crane added as second sponsor |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 243: yeas 48, nays 0 |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Amendment #1 (Raatz) prevailed; voice vote |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2022-02-10 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Family and Children Services |
2022-02-01 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2022-01-31 | House | Senate sponsor: Senator Donato |
2022-01-31 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 149: yeas 93, nays 0 |
2022-01-27 | House | Representative Jackson added as coauthor |
2022-01-27 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2022-01-24 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2022-01-20 | House | Representatives Olthoff and Bartels added as coauthors |
2022-01-11 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Family, Children and Human Affairs |
2022-01-11 | House | Authored by Representative Snow |