IN HB1317 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-01 - Public Law 138
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-01 - Public Law 138
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Expiration of committees and interstate compacts. Provides that a committee, board, commission, or task force (committee) created by the general assembly after June 30, 2023, expires if the committee does not meet within two years after the effective date of the statute creating the committee. Provides that the statutes creating the following compacts expire July 1, 2025: (1) The Interstate Jobs Protection Compact. (2) The Interstate High Speed Intercity Rail Passenger Network Compact. (3) The Interstate Compact on Community Corrections Transfers. Requires the governor to give notice to each state, if any, that is a party to each compact that the state of Indiana is withdrawing from the compact. Requires the governor to certify before January 1, 2024, with respect to each compact, that notice either: (1) has been given regarding Indiana's withdrawal from the compact; or (2) was not required to be given because there are no other party states to which to give notice.
Title
Expiration of committees and interstate compacts.
Sponsors
Rep. Doug Miller [R] | Rep. Dennis Zent [R] | Rep. Jim Pressel [R] | Sen. Blake Doriot [R] |
Sen. Rick Niemeyer [R] | Sen. Gary Byrne [R] | Sen. Eric Koch [R] | Sen. Andy Zay [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-04-20 - House - House - House concurred in Senate amendments (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2023-03-27 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-13 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 97 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-27 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-13 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 97 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-01 | House | Public Law 138 |
2023-05-01 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2023-04-26 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2023-04-24 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2023-04-20 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 471: yeas 90, nays 0 |
2023-04-19 | House | Motion to concur filed |
2023-04-11 | Senate | Senate advisors appointed: Yoder, Niemeyer and Byrne |
2023-04-11 | Senate | Senate conferees appointed: Doriot and Breaux |
2023-04-06 | House | House advisors appointed: Karickhoff, Zent and Harris |
2023-04-06 | House | House conferees appointed: Miller D and Campbell |
2023-04-06 | House | House dissented from Senate amendments |
2023-04-06 | House | Motion to dissent filed |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Returned to the House with amendments |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 254: yeas 48, nays 1 |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Amendment #1 (Doriot) prevailed; voice vote |
2023-03-20 | Senate | Senators Byrne, Koch, Zay added as cosponsors |
2023-03-20 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2023-03-06 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Commerce and Technology |
2023-02-14 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2023-02-13 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 107: yeas 97, nays 1 |
2023-02-13 | House | Senate sponsors: Senators Doriot and Niemeyer |
2023-02-09 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2023-02-07 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2023-01-12 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Government and Regulatory Reform |
2023-01-12 | House | Authored by Representative Miller D |
2023-01-12 | House | Coauthored by Representatives Zent and Pressel |
Subjects
CORRECTION, Community Programs
GOVERNOR
MENTAL HEALTH, State Department and Institutions
RAILROADS
STATE GOVERNMENT
GOVERNOR
MENTAL HEALTH, State Department and Institutions
RAILROADS
STATE GOVERNMENT