IN HB1313 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-4)
Status: Enrolled on March 24 2021 - 75% progression
Action: 2021-04-13 - House concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 418: yeas 92, nays 0
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Students with disabilities. Requires the Indiana management performance hub to: (1) use its data resources and technology to cross-reference with data bases of certain state agencies to identify certain former students with disabilities (eligible individuals); (2) coordinate with the state department of health to determine whether identified eligible individuals are deceased; and (3) provide the information concerning eligible individuals to the department of workforce development (DWD). Requires the state department of health to, not later than November 1, 2021, coordinate with the Indiana management performance hub. Requires the DWD to: (1) communicate with identified eligible individuals; and (2) provide to the eligible individuals a copy of a resource list concerning training and education opportunities and employment services resources. Requires the state advisory council on the education of children with disabilities (council) to annually update and submit the resource list to the department of education and the DWD. Requires the department of education and DWD to post a copy of the most recently updated resource list on the department's and DWD's Internet web sites. Requires the DWD, in consultation with the department of education, to prepare and submit an annual report to the general assembly and the council. Requires the state board of education to, not later than December 1, 2021, adopt rules to create an alternate diploma for students with significant cognitive disabilities.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Students with disabilities.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-13 - House - House - House concurred in Senate amendments (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-13HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 418: yeas 92, nays 0
2021-04-12HouseMotion to concur filed
2021-03-24SenateReturned to the House with amendments
2021-03-23SenateSenator Houchin added as cosponsor
2021-03-23SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 263: yeas 48, nays 0
2021-03-22SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2021-03-18SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2021-03-04SenateSenators Yoder and Qaddoura added as cosponsors
2021-02-23SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Education and Career Development
2021-02-17HouseReferred to the Senate
2021-02-16HouseCosponsor: Senator Ford J.D.
2021-02-16HouseSenate sponsors: Senators Kruse, Donato, Ford Jon
2021-02-16HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 144: yeas 97, nays 0
2021-02-15HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2021-02-11HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2021-01-14HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Education
2021-01-14HouseCoauthored by Representatives Pfaff, Davis, Behning
2021-01-14HouseAuthored by Representative Clere

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2021/bills/house/1313/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/7/5/0/5750b4a9/HB1313.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/8/0/7/f8076879/HB1313.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/7/1/a/471a679e/HB1313.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/f/6/6/3f6635c7/HB1313.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/9/f/2/59f28bbb/HB1313.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/1/b/0/51b0405c/HB1313.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/f/8/4/bf84cc10/HB1313.04.ENRS.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/5/f/9/95f920c4/HB1313.01.INTR.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/4/9/3/b493ae92/HB1313.01.INTR.CRH001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/3/a/0/e3a08c60/HB1313.02.COMH.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/7/0/8/57084422/HB1313.02.COMH.FN002.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/a/9/1/ea91eb8b/HB1313.02.COMH.FN003.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/8/f/3/f8f37bb0/HB1313.02.COMH.CRS001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/b/d/4/bbd4df7b/HB1313.03.COMS.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/7/7/2/277268e1/HB1313.03.COMS.FN002.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/9/b/1/79b1c05e/HB1313.03.COMS.FN003.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/5/5/e/c55ef24a/HB1313.03.COMS.CON01.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/e/f/0/9ef074f7/HB1313.01.INTR.02.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/8/7/c/087ccb8e/HB1313.144_H.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/4/a/5/14a5ff76/HB1313.02.COMH.01.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/7/9/e/379ed74c/HB1313.263_S.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/6/f/1/a6f10f87/HB1313.418_H.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback