IN HB1313 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on March 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-30 - Public Law 162
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Courts and family law matters. Provides that a magistrate has the same powers as a judge, except the power of judicial mandate. Repeals certain sections that enumerate the powers for magistrates. Repeals the judicial technology oversight committee. Increases the filing limit for the small claims docket to not more than $8,000 (rather than $6,000, under current law). Provides that the Marion County court will divide the work of the court into various divisions, including but not limited to the following: (1) Civil. (2) Criminal. (3) Family. Provides that the Marion County court shall hold session in the: (1) community justice campus in Indianapolis; and (2) other places in Marion County as the court determines. Provides that a relocating individual who is party to a custody order or parenting time order is not required to file a notice of intent to move with the clerk of the court if: (1) the relocation has been addressed by a prior court order; or (2) the relocation will: (A) result in a decrease in the distance between the relocating individual's residence and the nonrelocating individual's residence; or (B) result in an increase of not more than 20 miles in the distance between the relocating individual's residence and the nonrelocating individual's residence. Makes conforming amendments.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Courts and family law matters.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-09 - House - House - House concurred in Senate amendments (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 23) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-22 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-30HousePublic Law 162
2020-03-21HouseSigned by the Governor
2020-03-18SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2020-03-12SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2020-03-10HouseSigned by the Speaker
2020-03-09HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 332: yeas 76, nays 0
2020-03-05HouseMotion to concur filed
2020-03-04SenateReturned to the House with amendments
2020-03-03SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 311: yeas 48, nays 0
2020-03-02SenateSenator Randolph added as cosponsor
2020-03-02SenateSenator Young M added as second sponsor
2020-03-02SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2020-02-27SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2020-02-17SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary
2020-01-29HouseReferred to the Senate
2020-01-28HouseSenate sponsor: Senator Koch
2020-01-28HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 105: yeas 97, nays 0
2020-01-27HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2020-01-23HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2020-01-14HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Courts and Criminal Code
2020-01-14HouseCoauthored by Representative Steuerwald
2020-01-14HouseAuthored by Representative Young J

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2020/bills/house/1313/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/2/9/e/129e4ff5/HB1313.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/4/7/9/3479d475/HB1313.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/7/6/c/176cd16f/HB1313.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/5/b/6/75b65f41/HB1313.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/8/e/a/58ea19ef/HB1313.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/1/1/e/811e58d8/HB1313.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/0/6/5/a065c1ab/HB1313.04.ENRS.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/4/7/8/2478d616/HB1313.01.INTR.01.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/a/c/5/9ac5d467/HB1313.105_H.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/a/a/b/baab356d/HB1313.02.COMH.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/b/c/a/6bca2cd4/HB1313.311_S.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/2/4/b/724b783f/HB1313.332_H.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback