IN HB1310 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-13 - Public Law 69
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-13 - Public Law 69
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Specifies that when the bell of a locomotive becomes inoperable after the daily inspection required under the Code of Federal Regulations, the locomotive may be operated until the next required daily inspection. Makes technical corrections and conforming amendments. Removes outdated language.
Title
Bell requirements on a locomotive.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-25 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-02-19 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-02-19 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-13 | House | Public Law 69 |
2013-04-15 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2013-03-28 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2013-03-25 | Senate | Returned to the House without amendments |
2013-03-25 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 306: yeas 46 and nays 0 |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2013-02-25 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Homeland Security, Transportation and Veterans Affairs |
2013-02-19 | House | Senate sponsors: Senators Landske and Skinner |
2013-02-19 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2013-02-19 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 153: yeas 96, nays 0 |
2013-02-18 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2013-02-14 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2013-01-23 | House | Representative Kersey added as coauthor |
2013-01-23 | House | Representative Saunders added as author |
2013-01-23 | House | Representative Kersey removed as author |
2013-01-14 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Roads and Transportation |
2013-01-14 | House | Authored by Representative Kersey |