IN HB1305 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 10-6)
Status: Passed on April 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-26 - Public Law 132
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 10-6)
Status: Passed on April 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-26 - Public Law 132
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Medicaid reimbursement for children's hospitals. Specifies the reimbursement rate for inpatient and outpatient Medicaid services that are provided by an out-of-state children's hospital located in a state bordering Indiana in state fiscal years 2022 and 2023. Requires budget committee review of the reimbursements provided to those out-of-state children's hospital. Requires the children's hospitals to provide information required in the review to the family and social services administration not later than August 1.
Title
Medicaid reimbursement for children's hospitals.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-12 - House - House - House concurred in Senate amendments (Y: 83 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-26 | House | Public Law 132 |
2021-04-26 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2021-04-15 | House | Representatives Jackson and Harris added as coauthors |
2021-04-15 | House | Rule 105.1 suspended |
2021-04-13 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2021-04-12 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 399: yeas 83, nays 0 |
2021-04-08 | House | Motion to concur filed |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Returned to the House with amendments |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Senator Melton added as cosponsor |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as cosponsor |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Senator Niezgodski added as cosponsor |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Senator Leising added as cosponsor |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Senator Alting added as cosponsor |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 293: yeas 50, nays 0 |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Senator Garten added as cosponsor |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 68(b); reassigned to Committee on Appropriations |
2021-02-23 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Health and Provider Services |
2021-02-12 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2021-02-11 | House | Cosponsor: Senator Tallian |
2021-02-11 | House | Senate sponsors: Senators Bohacek, Charbonneau, Niemeyer |
2021-02-11 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 110: yeas 93, nays 0 |
2021-02-08 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2021-02-04 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2021-01-14 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2021-01-14 | House | Coauthored by Representatives Soliday, Clere, Olthoff |
2021-01-14 | House | Authored by Representative Slager |