IN HB1305 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-12 - First reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-12 - First reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Rush County and Rushville food and beverage tax. Authorizes Rush County to adopt a county food and beverage tax after April 30, 2016, and before November 1, 2016. Provides that the tax rate may not exceed 1%. Provides that money received from the tax shall be distributed by the treasurer of state as follows: (1) 50% to the county. (2) 50% to the city of Rushville. Specifies that if Rush County does not adopt a food and beverage tax before November 1, 2016, the city of Rushville may adopt a municipal food and beverage tax after October 31, 2016. Provides
Title
Rush County and Rushville food and beverage tax. Authorizes Rush County to adopt a county food and beverage tax after April 30, 2016, and before November 1, 2016. Provides that the tax rate may not exceed 1%. Provides that money received from the tax shall be distributed by the treasurer of state as follows: (1) 50% to the county. (2) 50% to the city of Rushville. Specifies that if Rush County does not adopt a food and beverage tax before November 1, 2016, the city of Rushville may adopt a municipal food and beverage tax after October 31, 2016. Provides
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-12 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2016-01-12 | House | Coauthored by Representative Ziemke |
2016-01-12 | House | Authored by Representative Saunders |
Indiana State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://iga.in.gov/legislative/2016/bills/house/1305/details |
Text | http://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/0/d/0/e0d0980d/HB1305.01.INTR.pdf |