IN HB1303 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-08 - Public Law 40
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-08 - Public Law 40
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Electronic powers of attorney, trusts, and wills. Allows a testator to execute an electronic will. Specifies requirements pertaining to the: (1) creation; (2) attestation; and (3) execution; of an electronic will. Allows video recordings of an electronic will's execution to be used for demonstrating: (1) proper execution of a will; (2) testator intent; (3) the mental state of a testator; (4) the absence of undue influence or duress with respect to a testator; and (5) verification of the individual identities involved in the execution of an electronic will. Provides exemplar instructions and advisory language to testators with respect to electronic
Title
Electronic powers of attorney, trusts, and wills. Allows a testator to execute an electronic will. Specifies requirements pertaining to the: (1) creation; (2) attestation; and (3) execution; of an electronic will. Allows video recordings of an electronic will's execution to be used for demonstrating: (1) proper execution of a will; (2) testator intent; (3) the mental state of a testator; (4) the absence of undue influence or duress with respect to a testator; and (5) verification of the individual identities involved in the execution of an electronic will. Provides exemplar instructions and advisory language to testators with respect to electronic
Sponsors
Rep. Gregory Steuerwald [R] | Rep. Edward DeLaney [D] | Rep. Thomas Washburne [R] | Rep. Ryan Hatfield [D] |
Sen. Rodric Bray [R] | Sen. Timothy Lanane [D] | Sen. Joseph Zakas [R] | Sen. Lonnie Randolph [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-02-27 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 49 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-01-22 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-01-22 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-08 | House | Public Law 40 |
2018-03-08 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2018-03-05 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Returned to the House without amendments |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 259: yeas 49, nays 1 |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as cosponsor |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Senator Zakas added as third sponsor |
2018-02-01 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2018-01-30 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2018-01-29 | House | Representatives Washburne and Hatfield added as coauthors |
2018-01-29 | House | Representative DeLaney added as coauthor |
2018-01-29 | House | Senate sponsors: Senators Bray and Lanane |
2018-01-29 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 63: yeas 95, nays 0 |
2018-01-25 | House | Amendment #1 (Washburne) prevailed; voice vote |
2018-01-25 | House | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2018-01-22 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2018-01-11 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2018-01-11 | House | Authored by Representative Steuerwald |