IN HB1301 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 13 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-27 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Repeals the statute requiring the division of fire and building safety (division) to employ a state building law compliance officer. Creates the office of state building commissioner, who is appointed by the governor to serve: (1) at the pleasure of the governor; and (2) full time. Provides that the state building commissioner has the duties and responsibilities of the state building law compliance officer. Requires the state building commissioner to issue a written interpretation of a building law or fire safety law not later than 10 business days after the date of receiving a request. Provides that a design release may be issued without a plan review if: (1) the application for a design release is complete; and (2) the application for a design release is not selected for a plan review by the division. Establishes deadlines for the division to conduct plan reviews and provide notices. Provides that, with certain exceptions, if the division fails to provide notice or complete plan review within the time required by statute, a design release must be issued without further review. Provides that if a plan review reveals one or more state building or fire code violations determined by the division to pose a substantial threat to the public health, safety, or welfare: (1) the division is required to notify: (A) the preparer of the plans; (B) the licensing agency of the preparer for possible disciplinary sanctions; and (C) the project owner or general contractor; and (2) the time limitations for plan review do not apply. Requires the division to maintain a single electronic file regarding each project for which a design release application is filed. Requires the fire prevention and building safety to established objective criteria for certifying the competency of a city,

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Fire and building safety issues.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-03-05 - House - House - Motion to Concur in Senate Amendments (Y: 71 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2014-03-04 - Senate - Senate Floor - (Y: 43 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-02-24 - Senate - Senate Committee on Commerce, Economic Development & Technology - Roll Call 130102 (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-27 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 79 N: 15 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-21 - House - House Committee on Veterans Affairs and Public Safety - Roll Call 130101 (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-03-27HouseSigned by the Governor
2014-03-27HouseSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2014-03-18SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2014-03-13HousePublic Law 218
2014-03-05HouseMotion to Concur in Senate Amendments: prevailed; Roll Call 421: yeas 71 and nays 15
2014-03-04SenateReturned to the House with amendments
2014-03-04SenateThird reading: Passed: Roll Call 325: yeas 43 and nays 4
2014-03-03SenateSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed.
2014-03-03SenateHB 1301 Amendment #4 (Yoder), prevailed.
2014-02-25SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted.
2014-02-04SenateFirst Reading: Referred to Commerce, Economic Development & Technology
2014-01-27HouseSenator Arnold added as 2nd sponsor.
2014-01-27HouseSenator Yoder added as sponsor.
2014-01-27HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 66: yeas 79 and nays 15
2014-01-27HouseReferred to the Senate
2014-01-23HouseSecond reading: engrossed
2014-01-23HouseAmendment #1 (Austin) motion withdrawn.
2014-01-21HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2014-01-15HouseFirst Reading: Referred to Veterans Affairs and Public Safety
2014-01-15HouseCoauthored by Representatives Messmer, Moed, GiaQuinta
2014-01-13HouseAuthored by Representative VanNatter.

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2014/bills/house/1301/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/e/2/d/5e2d9bff/HB1301.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/d/8/8/7d88990d/HB1301.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/e/e/3/bee3c84a/HB1301.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/2/3/8/1238e485/HB1301.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/8/a/b/d8ab84e8/HB1301.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/a/4/0/6a405643/HB1301.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/3/8/0/93807db2/HB1301.04.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/3/8/9/8389695c/HB1301.04.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/c/7/3/bc73cb46/HB1301.05.ENRH.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/c/d/b/8cdb9661/HB1301.01.INTR.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/d/1/0/fd106399/HB1301.02.COMH.66.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/8/8/8/88884d3e/HB1301.02.COMH.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/e/6/1/be61340d/HB1301.04.ENGS.325.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/f/b/c/3fbc3f88/HB1301.04.ENGS.421.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback