IN HB1299 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on May 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-02 - Public Law 207
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Veterans affairs. Requires the office of judicial administration with the United States Department of Veterans Affairs to identify and address the needs of veterans in the court system.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Veterans affairs. Requires the office of judicial administration with the United States Department of Veterans Affairs to identify and address the needs of veterans in the court system.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-16 - House - House - House concurred in Senate amendments (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - House - Third reading (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-02HousePublic Law 207
2019-05-02HouseSigned by the Governor
2019-04-30SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2019-04-18SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2019-04-18HouseSigned by the Speaker
2019-04-16HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 537: yeas 92, nays 0
2019-04-16HouseMotion to concur filed
2019-04-10SenateReturned to the House with amendments
2019-04-09SenateSenator Randolph added as cosponsor
2019-04-09SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 426: yeas 48, nays 0
2019-04-08SenateSenator Garten added as second sponsor
2019-04-08SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2019-04-04SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2019-03-04SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary
2019-02-20HouseReferred to the Senate
2019-02-19HouseSenate sponsor: Senator Glick
2019-02-19HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 220: yeas 96, nays 0
2019-02-18HouseRepresentatives Bauer and Baird added as coauthors
2019-02-18HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2019-02-14HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2019-01-14HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Courts and Criminal Code
2019-01-14HouseCoauthored by Representative Clere
2019-01-14HouseAuthored by Representative Zent

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2019/bills/house/1299/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/8/1/9/c819855a/HB1299.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/c/c/3/dcc301a4/HB1299.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/c/9/7/fc97f401/HB1299.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/5/f/2/65f282ca/HB1299.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/d/a/b/9dab7934/HB1299.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/a/5/9/ea594cd1/HB1299.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/f/c/b/5fcb0e64/HB1299.04.ENRS.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/8/9/d/989def46/HB1299.01.INTR.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/5/e/c/85ec7e16/HB1299.220.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/5/3/8/e5382771/HB1299.02.COMH.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/2/c/e/92ce9ee2/HB1299.426.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/4/7/9/a4792fe3/HB1299.537.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback