IN HB1298 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on March 24 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-24 - Public Law 206
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Annexation. Changes contiguity requirements so that property adjacent to only one side of the public highway (instead of both sides) must be: (1) within the annexing municipality's boundaries; or (2) annexed by the same ordinance that annexes the public highway. Reduces the number of required public information meetings from six meetings to three meetings if the annexation is initiated by the landowners. Specifies that a landowner whose property is subject to a valid waiver of remonstrance may not file a remonstrance to the annexation. Establishes deadlines for: (1) the county auditor to forward remonstrance petitions to the annexing municipality; and

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Annexation. Changes contiguity requirements so that property adjacent to only one side of the public highway (instead of both sides) must be: (1) within the annexing municipality's boundaries; or (2) annexed by the same ordinance that annexes the public highway. Reduces the number of required public information meetings from six meetings to three meetings if the annexation is initiated by the landowners. Specifies that a landowner whose property is subject to a valid waiver of remonstrance may not file a remonstrance to the annexation. Establishes deadlines for: (1) the county auditor to forward remonstrance petitions to the annexing municipality; and

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-03-10 - Senate - Senate - Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 49 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-09 - House - House - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 92 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-02-25 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 39 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-02-17 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-25 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-01-19 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-03-24HousePublic Law 206
2016-03-24HouseSigned by the Governor
2016-03-17SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2016-03-11SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2016-03-10HouseSigned by the Speaker
2016-03-10SenateConference Committee Report 1: adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 395: yeas 49, nays 1
2016-03-09HouseCCR # 1 filed in the House
2016-03-09HouseRules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the House; Roll Call 423: yeas 92, nays 2
2016-03-09SenateCCR # 1 filed in the Senate
2016-02-29SenateSenate advisors appointed: Buck, Taylor and Head
2016-02-29SenateSenate conferees appointed: Bray and Broden
2016-02-29HouseHouse advisors appointed: Truitt, Cherry and Bartlett
2016-02-29HouseHouse conferees appointed: Negele and Errington
2016-02-29HouseHouse dissented from Senate Amendments
2016-02-29HouseMotion to dissent filed
2016-02-26SenateReturned to the House with amendments
2016-02-25SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 226: yeas 39, nays 6
2016-02-22SenateAmendment #1 (Bray) prevailed; voice vote
2016-02-22SenateSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2016-02-18SenateSenator Buck added as second sponsor
2016-02-18SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2016-02-08SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Local Government
2016-01-26HouseReferred to the Senate
2016-01-25HouseRepresentatives Nisly and Errington added as coauthors
2016-01-25HouseSenate sponsor: Senator Bray
2016-01-25HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 36: yeas 93, nays 0
2016-01-21HouseAmendment #1 (Lyness) prevailed; voice vote
2016-01-21HouseSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2016-01-19HouseRepresentative Truitt added as coauthor
2016-01-19HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2016-01-12HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Government and Regulatory Reform
2016-01-12HouseAuthored by Representative Negele

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2016/bills/house/1298/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/3/4/7/e347f501/HB1298.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/5/5/a/d55ab978/HB1298.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/c/5/0/cc507a2a/HB1298.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/3/a/c/63ac9aa5/HB1298.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/c/d/a/9cda1674/HB1298.03.ENGH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/6/d/d/26ddba61/HB1298.03.ENGH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/4/3/f/543faf1b/HB1298.04.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/b/f/e/1bfe4bfa/HB1298.04.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/9/6/d/596d1d66/HB1298.05.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/b/c/4/5bc474ac/HB1298.05.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/f/9/9/7f99ef55/HB1298.06.ENRS.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/7/8/b/278b043c/HB1298.01.INTR.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/5/3/0/4530ce49/HB1298.36.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/e/c/a/feca7de4/HB1298.03.ENGH.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/f/2/6/7f268e90/HB1298.226.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/9/e/8/49e8a8ea/HB1298.423.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/4/7/f/a47fa4ee/HB1298.395.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback