IN HB1294 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on February 29 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-15 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on February 29 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-15 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Various securities division matters.
Title
Various securities division matters.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-06 - House - House - House concurred in Senate amendments (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2012-02-29 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 47 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-30 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-02-29 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 47 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-30 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-15 | Signed by the Governor | |
2012-03-08 | Signed by the President of the Senate | |
2012-03-07 | Signed by the President Pro Tempore | |
2012-03-06 | Signed by the Speaker | |
2012-03-06 | House concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 345: yeas 88, nays 0 | |
2012-02-29 | Returned to the House with amendments | |
2012-02-29 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 294: yeas 47 and nays 3 | |
2012-02-28 | Amendment 2 (Smith), prevailed; voice vote | |
2012-02-28 | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed | |
2012-02-21 | Senator Mrvan added as cosponsor | |
2012-02-16 | Committee report: do pass, adopted | |
2012-02-01 | First reading: referred to Committee on Insurance and Financial Institutions | |
2012-01-30 | Senate sponsor: Senator Smith | |
2012-01-30 | Referred to the Senate | |
2012-01-30 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 107: yeas 93, nays 0 | |
2012-01-26 | Second reading: ordered engrossed | |
2012-01-23 | Committee report: do pass, adopted | |
2012-01-11 | First reading: referred to Committee on Financial Institutions | |
2012-01-11 | Coauthored by Representative Burton | |
2012-01-11 | Authored by Representative Heaton |