IN HB1290 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-3)
Status: Passed on March 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-21 - Public Law 185
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Transportation finance. Repeals the motor carrier surcharge tax and increases the special fuel tax by $0.21 per gallon. Distributes part of the special fuel tax revenue to the motor carrier regulation fund. Specifies how netted International Fuel Tax Agreement Clearinghouse refunds and receipts are deposited or credited. Specifies that the commercial vehicle excise tax rate calculation that must be done on or before October 1 of each year is effective on January 1 of the following year. Excludes the transportation infrastructure improvement fee and the supplemental fees for registering electric and hybrid vehicles from the calculation of the commercial vehicle

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Transportation finance. Repeals the motor carrier surcharge tax and increases the special fuel tax by $0.21 per gallon. Distributes part of the special fuel tax revenue to the motor carrier regulation fund. Specifies how netted International Fuel Tax Agreement Clearinghouse refunds and receipts are deposited or credited. Specifies that the commercial vehicle excise tax rate calculation that must be done on or before October 1 of each year is effective on January 1 of the following year. Excludes the transportation infrastructure improvement fee and the supplemental fees for registering electric and hybrid vehicles from the calculation of the commercial vehicle

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-08 - House - House - House concurred in Senate amendments (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 21) [PASS]
2018-03-05 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 40 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 89 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-01-24 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-21HousePublic Law 185
2018-03-21HouseSigned by the Governor
2018-03-19SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2018-03-14SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2018-03-13HouseSigned by the Speaker
2018-03-08HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 358: yeas 78, nays 0
2018-03-08HouseMotion to concur filed
2018-03-06SenateReturned to the House with amendments
2018-03-05SenateSenator Tomes added as cosponsor
2018-03-05SenateSenator Tallian added as cosponsor
2018-03-05SenateSenator Niezgodski added as cosponsor
2018-03-05SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 298: yeas 40, nays 9
2018-03-01SenateAmendment #1 (Tomes) prevailed; voice vote
2018-03-01SenateSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2018-02-27SenateSenator Bassler added as second sponsor
2018-02-26SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2018-02-06SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Appropriations
2018-02-02HouseReferred to the Senate
2018-02-01HouseRepresentatives Lindauer and Taylor J added as coauthors
2018-02-01HouseSenate sponsor: Senator Mishler
2018-02-01HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 136: yeas 89, nays 1
2018-01-31HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2018-01-29HouseCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2018-01-25HouseReferred to the Committee on Ways and Means pursuant to House Rule 127
2018-01-25HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2018-01-11HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Roads and Transportation
2018-01-11HouseCoauthored by Representative Brown T
2018-01-11HouseAuthored by Representative Soliday

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2018/bills/house/1290/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/7/5/8/2758b67c/HB1290.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/9/7/9/2979856b/HB1290.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/4/0/1/04016eaa/HB1290.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/a/e/c/7aec801f/HB1290.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/d/3/8/8d38469b/HB1290.03.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/8/b/e/c8beaec2/HB1290.03.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/1/4/2/b1427f07/HB1290.04.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/8/6/8/78688ddd/HB1290.04.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/3/1/b/631bc028/HB1290.05.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/e/e/4/4ee4a6fc/HB1290.05.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/6/2/a/d62ab72a/HB1290.06.ENRS.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/b/a/0/3ba03847/HB1290.01.INTR.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/c/1/9/9c19d417/HB1290.02.COMH.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/d/8/8/ed883a71/HB1290.136.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/2/7/3/c2731d21/HB1290.03.COMH.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/5/f/c/35fc6ec9/HB1290.298.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/2/f/3/42f336cd/HB1290.358.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback