IN HB1290 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Passed on March 24 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-24 - Public Law 204
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

State and local administration. Reorganizes the statutes concerning riverboat admissions tax distributions by: (1) moving distribution provisions for the Lake County riverboats into a new section organized by riverboat; and (2) moving into a new section provisions concerning the use of admissions tax revenue and the supplemental distribution. Allocates the admissions tax revenue that is paid to the northwest Indiana redevelopment authority (RDA) in satisfaction of Lake County's obligations to the authority equally among the four riverboats operating in Lake County. Changes the deadline for paying the supplemental distribution from September 15 to July 15. Provides for quarterly payments of

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State and local administration. Reorganizes the statutes concerning riverboat admissions tax distributions by: (1) moving distribution provisions for the Lake County riverboats into a new section organized by riverboat; and (2) moving into a new section provisions concerning the use of admissions tax revenue and the supplemental distribution. Allocates the admissions tax revenue that is paid to the northwest Indiana redevelopment authority (RDA) in satisfaction of Lake County's obligations to the authority equally among the four riverboats operating in Lake County. Changes the deadline for paying the supplemental distribution from September 15 to July 15. Provides for quarterly payments of

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-03-10 - House - House - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-03-10 - Senate - Senate - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 49 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-03 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-01-21 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-03-24HousePublic Law 204
2016-03-24HouseSigned by the Governor
2016-03-17SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2016-03-16SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2016-03-15HouseSigned by the Speaker
2016-03-10HouseCCR # 1 filed in the House
2016-03-10HouseRules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the House; Roll Call 452: yeas 95, nays 0
2016-03-10SenateRules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 418: yeas 49, nays 1
2016-03-10SenateCCR # 1 filed in the Senate
2016-03-03SenateSenate advisors appointed: Mishler, Broden and Charbonneau
2016-03-03SenateSenate conferees appointed: Hershman and Rogers
2016-03-03HouseHouse advisors appointed: Huston, Slager and Brown C
2016-03-03HouseHouse conferees appointed: Brown T and Porter
2016-03-02HouseHouse dissented from Senate Amendments
2016-03-02HouseMotion to dissent filed
2016-03-02SenateReturned to the House with amendments
2016-03-01SenateSenator Holdman added as second sponsor
2016-03-01SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 286: yeas 50, nays 0
2016-02-29SenateAmendment #2 (Miller Pete) prevailed; voice vote
2016-02-29SenateAmendment #5 (Walker) prevailed; voice vote
2016-02-29SenateAmendment #1 (Niemeyer) prevailed; voice vote
2016-02-29SenateAmendment #3 (Hershman) prevailed; voice vote
2016-02-29SenateSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2016-02-25SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2016-02-23SenateSenator Randolph added as cosponsor
2016-02-23SenateSenator Rogers added as cosponsor
2016-02-08SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Tax & Fiscal Policy
2016-02-03HouseReferred to the Senate
2016-02-03HouseRepresentatives Porter, Koch, Burton added as coauthors
2016-02-03HouseSenate sponsor: Senator Hershman
2016-02-03HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 166: yeas 98, nays 0
2016-02-02HouseAmendment #1 (Pryor) prevailed; voice vote
2016-02-02HouseSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2016-01-25HouseCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2016-01-12HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means
2016-01-12HouseAuthored by Representative Brown T

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2016/bills/house/1290/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/2/1/0/32100ebf/HB1290.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/4/b/e/84be97f0/HB1290.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/b/c/6/fbc6bb37/HB1290.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/8/f/8/48f8ba2e/HB1290.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/4/7/b/547b190e/HB1290.03.ENGH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/4/9/7/8497d729/HB1290.03.ENGH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/3/9/e/d39e20f3/HB1290.04.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/8/5/a/d85a25ff/HB1290.04.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/2/c/a/b2caa6ef/HB1290.05.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/3/d/5/e3d58786/HB1290.05.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/8/8/c/988c1d69/HB1290.06.ENRS.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/6/e/a/16ea65f7/HB1290.01.INTR.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/9/0/4/d9042be7/HB1290.166.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/c/4/b/4c4b0d9c/HB1290.03.ENGH.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/6/1/8/f6187acd/HB1290.286.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/4/6/9/6469ed3c/HB1290.418.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/6/f/7/16f7ca24/HB1290.452.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback