IN HB1286 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 18 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-02-24 - First reading: referred to Committee on Health and Provider Services
Pending: Senate Health and Provider Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Telehealth matters. Provides for a standard definition of telehealth in titles 12, 16, 25, and 27. Prohibits the Medicaid program from specifying originating sites and distant sites for purposes of Medicaid reimbursement. Changes the use of the term "telemedicine" to "telehealth". Expands the application of the telehealth statute to additional licensed practitioners instead of applying only to prescribers. Provides that veterinarians may provide telehealth services only when an existing veterinarian-client-patient relationship has been established. Amends the definition of "telehealth". Requires that the telehealth medical records be created and maintained under the same standards of appropriate practice for medical records for patients in an in-person setting. Amends requirements for a prescriber issuing a prescription to a patient via telehealth services. Specifies that a patient waives confidentiality of medical information concerning individuals in the vicinity when the patient is using telehealth. Prohibits certain health care policies that provide coverage for telehealth services from requiring the use of a specific information technology application for those services.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Telehealth matters.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-17 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-02-08 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-24SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Health and Provider Services
2021-02-18HouseReferred to the Senate
2021-02-17HouseSenate sponsors: Senators Charbonneau and Messmer
2021-02-17HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 182: yeas 93, nays 0
2021-02-16HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2021-02-08HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2021-01-14HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Public Health
2021-01-14HouseCoauthored by Representatives Barrett, Vermilion, Teshka
2021-01-14HouseAuthored by Representative Lindauer

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2021/bills/house/1286/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/2/6/2/42627461/HB1286.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/9/e/7/29e7304c/HB1286.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/d/3/5/4d358c43/HB1286.02.COMH.pdf
Amendmenthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/a/9/f/da9f4934/HB1286.02.COMH.AMH001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/6/1/a/c61a8dbb/HB1286.01.INTR.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/c/4/6/8c46b908/HB1286.01.INTR.CRH001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/1/b/f/41bfbe45/HB1286.02.COMH.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/b/7/c/eb7cdeb9/HB1286.02.COMH.FN002.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/7/c/c/e7ccac03/HB1286.02.COMH.FN003.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/1/b/d/c1bdf5fd/HB1286.01.INTR.03.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/8/7/a/187adb6c/HB1286.182_H.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback