IN HB1280 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on February 29 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-19 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on February 29 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-19 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that intrastate commerce in Indiana is not subject to the authority of the United States Congress. Permits certain administrative adjudication notices to be delivered by electronic mail or another method approved by the Indiana Rules of Trial Procedure. Requires the division of government efficiency and financial planning in the office of management and budget to advise and assist state agencies and instrumentalities with the implementation of continuous process improvement techniques. Provides that an agency may solicit comments from members of the public who are likely to be affected by a rule because they are the subject of the potential rulemaking or are likely to benefit from the potential rulemaking. Requires that state documents provided to the public must comply with certain document drafting standards. Requires each unit of local government that receives franchise fees paid to the unit from an entity providing video services to submit to the IURC an annual report on the unit's receipt and use of those franchise fees during the calendar year for which the report is submitted. Consolidates six categories of pharmacy licenses into three categories.
Title
Regulatory matters.
Sponsors
Sen. Eric Koch [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-03-10 - House - House - Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the House (Y: 66 N: 27 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-03-10 - Senate - Senate - Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the Senate (Y: 38 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-29 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 42 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-30 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 69 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-03-10 - Senate - Senate - Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the Senate (Y: 38 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-29 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 42 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-30 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 69 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-19 | Signed by the Governor | |
2012-03-14 | Signed by the President of the Senate | |
2012-03-13 | Signed by the Speaker | |
2012-03-13 | Signed by the President Pro Tempore | |
2012-03-10 | Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 368: yeas 38, nays 12 | |
2012-03-10 | Senate Rule 86(a) suspended | |
2012-03-10 | Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the House; Roll Call 420: yeas 66, nays 27 | |
2012-03-10 | Rules suspended | |
2012-03-09 | Senator Steele added as conferee | |
2012-03-09 | Senator Skinner removed as conferee | |
2012-03-09 | Conference committee report 1 : filed in the House | |
2012-03-09 | Representative Torr added as conferee | |
2012-03-09 | Representative Bartlett removed as conferee | |
2012-03-05 | Senate advisor appointed: Mishler and Broden | |
2012-03-05 | Senate conferee appointed: Hershman and Skinner | |
2012-03-05 | House advisors appointed: Mahan, Wesco and Stemler | |
2012-03-05 | House conferees appointed: Koch and Bartlett | |
2012-03-01 | House dissented from Senate amendments | |
2012-02-29 | Returned to the House with amendments | |
2012-02-29 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 293: yeas 42 and nays 8 | |
2012-02-27 | Amendment 3 (Hershman), prevailed; voice vote | |
2012-02-27 | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed | |
2012-02-23 | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted | |
2012-02-07 | Pursuant to Senate Rule 68(b); reassigned to Committee on Tax and Fiscal Policy | |
2012-02-01 | First reading: referred to Committee on Corrections, Criminal, and Civil Matters | |
2012-01-30 | Senate sponsor: Senator Hershman | |
2012-01-30 | Referred to the Senate | |
2012-01-30 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 108: yeas 69, nays 26 | |
2012-01-27 | Amendment 6 (Koch), prevailed; voice vote | |
2012-01-27 | Amendment 5 (Koch), prevailed; voice vote | |
2012-01-27 | Amendment 4 (Koch), prevailed; voice vote | |
2012-01-27 | Amendment 1 (Koch), prevailed; voice vote | |
2012-01-27 | Amendment 2 (M. Smith), prevailed; voice vote | |
2012-01-27 | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed | |
2012-01-23 | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted | |
2012-01-11 | First reading: referred to Committee on Government and Regulatory Reform | |
2012-01-11 | Authored by Representative Koch |