IN HB1279 | 2012 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on February 27 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-19 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Moves the state land office from the department of administration to the department of natural resources (DNR). Increases the amount that an office of DNR or the department of state revenue must deposit on the business day following receipt from $100 to $500. Increases the inspection period for each parcel of land classified as native forest land, a forest plantation, or wildlands from five to seven years. Amends law concerning the lake and river enhancement fund to prohibit funds from being used for projects related to a ditch or manmade channel. Defines "inland water". Provides that certain regulations related to using a spotlight or firearm silencer in the hunting of birds and mammals do not apply to a person acting in accordance with the conditions of a license held by the person. Allows the director of DNR to give certain individuals permission to spotlight wild animals or use a silencer. Requires that hunting license stamps be electronically generated. Removes the requirement that commemorative stamps be furnished to the circuit court. Allows fishing by means of a crossbow. Makes the invasive species pilot program a permanent program. Removes the authority for an individual with a hunting, trapping, or fishing license to ship, carry, or take outside of Indiana, in one week, more than two times the possession limit for the wild animal. Repeals the prohibition on raccoon hunting by nonresidents. Removes a provision allowing a federal Fish and Wildlife Service officer or a conservation officer from another jurisdiction to hunt or fish in Indiana after obtaining a resident license. Creates a resident license to hunt and fish that is valid for 10 years for certain veterans. Allows DNR to issue a nonresident fishing license for commercial fishing in Indiana on the Ohio River. Creates a license for nonresident roe harvesters and dealers. Allows the natural resources commission (commission) to establish the minimum application fees for nonresident roe harvester and dealer licenses. Gives residents of Indiana priority in receiving roe harvester and dealer licenses. Requires a business that sells or barters live minnows or crayfish to have a bait dealer's license. (Current law requires a business that takes, catches, sells, or barters live minnows or crayfish to have a bait dealer's license.) Increases the number of annual free sport fishing days that may be designated from two to four. Allows the sale of game and furbearing mammals for food purposes under a game breeding license. Removes authority to obtain a game breeder's license for game birds and game mammals acquired alive and legally in open season. Removes nutrias and swamp rabbits from the list of exempted animals under a game breeding license. Requires all individuals to have a hunting license to shoot on a shooting preserve, and removes the requirement that nonresidents have a special license to shoot on shooting preserves. Provides that the entirety of an area declared to be infested with a pest or pathogen must be operated according to standards of the natural resources commission. (Current law specifies the infested area in terms of portions of townships.) Changes the nursery stock certificate expiration date from September 30 to December 31. Changes the procedures that the commission must follow when mediating surface water disputes. Requires that bonds forfeited under the abandoned oil and gas well law be placed in the oil and gas environmental fund. Makes technical and conforming changes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Various natural resources matters.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-03-09 - House - House - Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the House (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-03-09 - Senate - Senate - Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-27 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-01-31 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 83 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-03-19 Signed by the Governor
2012-03-13 Signed by the President Pro Tempore
2012-03-12 Signed by the President of the Senate
2012-03-09 Signed by the Speaker
2012-03-09 Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 351: yeas 49, nays 0
2012-03-09 Senate Rule 86(a) suspended
2012-03-09 Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the House; Roll Call 397: yeas 95, nays 0
2012-03-09 Rules suspended
2012-03-09 Conference committee report 1 : filed in the House
2012-03-06 Senate advisors appointed: Grooms, Hume and Banks
2012-03-06 Senate conferee appointed: Mishler and R. Young
2012-03-05 House advisors appointed: Ubelhor, Messmer, Davis and Battles
2012-03-05 House conferees appointed: Eberhart and Cheatham
2012-03-01 House dissented from Senate amendments
2012-02-27 Senators Delph and Buck added as cosponsors
2012-02-27 Returned to the House with amendments
2012-02-27 Third reading: passed; Roll Call 254: yeas 49 and nays 0
2012-02-21 Senators Holdman, Grooms, Banks, Kruse, Head and Walker added as cosponsors
2012-02-21 Amendment 2 (R. Young), prevailed; voice vote
2012-02-21 Amendment 1 (R. Young), prevailed; voice vote
2012-02-21 Amendment 4 (Holdman), prevailed; voice vote
2012-02-21 Amendment 3 (Mishler), prevailed; voice vote
2012-02-21 Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2012-02-14 Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
2012-02-13 Senator R. Young added as second sponsor
2012-02-01 First reading: referred to Committee on Agriculture and Natural Resources
2012-01-31 Senate sponsor: Senator Mishler
2012-01-31 Referred to the Senate
2012-01-31 Third reading: passed; Roll Call 178: yeas 83, nays 12
2012-01-30 Second reading: ordered engrossed
2012-01-26 Representative Cheatham added as coauthor
2012-01-26 Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
2012-01-11 First reading: referred to Committee on Natural Resources
2012-01-11 Authored by Representative Eberhart

Indiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback