IN HB1273 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 24 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-24 - Public Law 203
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Various property tax matters. Requires assessing officials to maintain geographic information system characteristics of real property parcels and to transmit that data annually to the geographic information office of the office of technology. Provides that personal property is exempt from property taxation if it is owned by a homeowners association and is held by the homeowners association for the use, benefit, or enjoyment of members of the homeowners association. Provides that a county auditor may accept a deduction application for a property tax abatement deduction only if the designating body has specified an abatement schedule for the deduction. Prohibits a

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Various property tax matters. Requires assessing officials to maintain geographic information system characteristics of real property parcels and to transmit that data annually to the geographic information office of the office of technology. Provides that personal property is exempt from property taxation if it is owned by a homeowners association and is held by the homeowners association for the use, benefit, or enjoyment of members of the homeowners association. Provides that a county auditor may accept a deduction application for a property tax abatement deduction only if the designating body has specified an abatement schedule for the deduction. Prohibits a

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-03-10 - House - House - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 97 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-10 - Senate - Senate - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-25 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-02-16 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-01 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 93 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-01-21 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-03-24HousePublic Law 203
2016-03-24HouseSigned by the Governor
2016-03-17SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2016-03-16SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2016-03-15HouseSigned by the Speaker
2016-03-10HouseCCR # 1 filed in the House
2016-03-10SenateRules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 406: yeas 50, nays 0
2016-03-10HouseRules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the House; Roll Call 438: yeas 97, nays 1
2016-03-10SenateCCR # 1 filed in the Senate
2016-03-02SenateSenate advisors appointed: Hershman, Broden and Kenley
2016-03-02SenateSenate conferees appointed: Mishler and Randolph Lonnie M
2016-03-02HouseHouse advisors appointed: Smith M, Goodin and Pryor
2016-03-02HouseHouse conferees appointed: Leonard and Porter
2016-02-29HouseHouse dissented from Senate Amendments
2016-02-29HouseMotion to dissent filed
2016-02-26SenateReturned to the House with amendments
2016-02-25SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 225: yeas 45, nays 0
2016-02-23SenateSenator Randolph added as cosponsor
2016-02-18SenateSenator Hershman added as second sponsor
2016-02-18SenateAmendment #1 (Hershman) prevailed; voice vote
2016-02-18SenateSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2016-02-16SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2016-02-08SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Tax & Fiscal Policy
2016-02-02HouseReferred to the Senate
2016-02-01HouseSenate sponsor: Senator Mishler
2016-02-01HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 99: yeas 93, nays 1
2016-01-28HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2016-01-25HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2016-01-11HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means
2016-01-11HouseAuthored by Representative Leonard

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2016/bills/house/1273/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/8/a/2/48a21b0b/HB1273.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/6/e/8/36e89d95/HB1273.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/6/c/f/46cff9be/HB1273.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/2/8/8/f288264b/HB1273.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/8/e/1/a8e1a631/HB1273.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/6/0/b/960b4876/HB1273.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/d/3/4/8d3494b6/HB1273.04.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/7/8/7/d78797c6/HB1273.04.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/e/4/5/de45a9e7/HB1273.05.ENRS.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/2/0/1/d201a900/HB1273.01.INTR.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/8/d/3/58d3dc50/HB1273.99.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/0/3/9/a03985c7/HB1273.02.COMH.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/3/9/6/13965c2f/HB1273.225.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/5/d/b/15db1803/HB1273.406.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/9/b/2/f9b20964/HB1273.438.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback