IN HB1273 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on February 21 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-15 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on February 21 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-15 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Requests the legislative council to study, during the 2012 legislative interim, the topic of creating a centralized department of administrative law judges within the office of the attorney general.
Title
Administrative law judge study.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-06 - House - House - House concurred in Senate amendments (Y: 87 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2012-02-21 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-30 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 93 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-02-21 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-30 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 93 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-15 | Signed by the Governor | |
2012-03-08 | Signed by the President of the Senate | |
2012-03-07 | Signed by the President Pro Tempore | |
2012-03-06 | Signed by the Speaker | |
2012-03-06 | House concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 344: yeas 87, nays 1 | |
2012-02-21 | Senator Buck added as cosponsor | |
2012-02-21 | Returned to the House with amendments | |
2012-02-21 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 231: yeas 50 and nays 0 | |
2012-02-20 | Senator Broden added as cosponsor | |
2012-02-20 | Senator Randolph added as cosponsor | |
2012-02-20 | Second reading: ordered engrossed | |
2012-02-16 | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted | |
2012-02-01 | First reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary | |
2012-01-30 | Senate sponsors: Senators Bray and Lawson | |
2012-01-30 | Referred to the Senate | |
2012-01-30 | Representatives DeLaney and Dvorak added as coauthors | |
2012-01-30 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 109: yeas 93, nays 1 | |
2012-01-26 | Second reading: ordered engrossed | |
2012-01-23 | Committee report: do pass, adopted | |
2012-01-23 | Representative Koch added as coauthor | |
2012-01-11 | First reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary | |
2012-01-11 | Authored by Representative Steuerwald |