IN HB1263 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-21 - Public Law 184
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-21 - Public Law 184
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
County jail issues. Provides that a county fiscal body may adopt an ordinance to impose (within the local income tax expenditure rate) a tax rate for correctional facilities and rehabilitation facilities in the county. Specifies that the tax rate must be in increments of 0.01% and may not exceed 0.2%. Provides that the tax rate may not be in effect for more than 20 years. Specifies that the revenue generated by such a tax rate: (1) must be distributed directly to the county before the remainder of the expenditure rate revenue is distributed; and (2) shall be maintained in a
Title
County jail issues. Provides that a county fiscal body may adopt an ordinance to impose (within the local income tax expenditure rate) a tax rate for correctional facilities and rehabilitation facilities in the county. Specifies that the tax rate must be in increments of 0.01% and may not exceed 0.2%. Provides that the tax rate may not be in effect for more than 20 years. Specifies that the revenue generated by such a tax rate: (1) must be distributed directly to the county before the remainder of the expenditure rate revenue is distributed; and (2) shall be maintained in a
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-14 - Senate - Senate - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 39 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-14 - House - House - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 71 N: 25 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 91 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-03-14 - House - House - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 71 N: 25 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 91 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-21 | House | Public Law 184 |
2018-03-21 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2018-03-19 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 419: yeas 39, nays 9 |
2018-03-14 | House | Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the House; Roll Call 406: yeas 71, nays 25 |
2018-03-14 | Senate | CCR # 1 filed in the Senate |
2018-03-14 | House | CCR # 1 filed in the House |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Senate advisors appointed: Young M, Breaux, Head and Freeman |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Senate conferees appointed: Sandlin and Stoops |
2018-03-07 | House | House advisors appointed: Lyness, Friend, Frye R, Beumer, Cook, Huston and Harris |
2018-03-07 | House | House conferees appointed: Brown T and Pryor |
2018-03-06 | House | House dissented from Senate amendments |
2018-03-06 | House | Motion to dissent filed |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Returned to the House with amendments |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as cosponsor |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Senator Buck added as second sponsor |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 271: yeas 48, nays 0 |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Amendment #3 (Tomes) prevailed; voice vote |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Amendment #2 (Sandlin) prevailed; voice vote |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 68(b); reassigned to Committee on Tax and Fiscal Policy |
2018-02-06 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Local Government |
2018-02-02 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2018-02-01 | House | Senate sponsor: Senator Sandlin |
2018-02-01 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 134: yeas 91, nays 1 |
2018-01-31 | House | Amendment #3 (Porter) ruled out of order |
2018-01-31 | House | Amendment #2 (Porter) failed; voice vote |
2018-01-31 | House | Amendment #1 (Porter) ruled out of order |
2018-01-31 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2018-01-29 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2018-01-11 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2018-01-11 | House | Authored by Representative Brown T |