IN HB1263 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-15 - Public Law 24
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-15 - Public Law 24
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Township trustee sale of cemetery plots. Provides that if a township trustee is maintaining a cemetery that dates back at least to 1939, has no maintenance funds of its own, and is operated by a nonprofit organization or not managed by any viable organization, the township trustee may sell plots in the cemetery that are not known to be owned by any plot owner. Requires that the proceeds from the sale be deposited in the township's fund for maintenance of cemeteries, if the township has such a fund, or in the township fund of the township.
Title
Township trustee sale of cemetery plots. Provides that if a township trustee is maintaining a cemetery that dates back at least to 1939, has no maintenance funds of its own, and is operated by a nonprofit organization or not managed by any viable organization, the township trustee may sell plots in the cemetery that are not known to be owned by any plot owner. Requires that the proceeds from the sale be deposited in the township's fund for maintenance of cemeteries, if the township has such a fund, or in the township fund of the township.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-17 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-11 - Senate - Senate Committee on Local Government - Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-02 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-01-22 - House - House Committee on Local Government - Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-11 - Senate - Senate Committee on Local Government - Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-02 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-01-22 - House - House Committee on Local Government - Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-15 | House | Public Law 24 |
2015-04-15 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2015-03-23 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Returned to the House without amendments |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Senators Randolph and Taylor added as cosponsor |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 305: yeas 50, nays 0 |
2015-03-16 | Senate | Senator Niemeyer added as cosponsor |
2015-03-16 | Senate | Senator Buck added as third sponsor |
2015-03-16 | Senate | Senator Leising added as second sponsor |
2015-03-16 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2015-02-24 | Senate | First Reading: Referred to committee on Local Government |
2015-02-03 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2015-02-02 | House | Senator Walker added as sponsor |
2015-02-02 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 53: yeas 94, nays 0 |
2015-01-29 | House | Representative Morris added as coauthor |
2015-01-29 | House | Representative Brown, T. removed as coauthor |
2015-01-29 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2015-01-27 | House | Representative Pryor added as coauthor |
2015-01-27 | House | Representative Stemler added as coauthor |
2015-01-26 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2015-01-22 | House | Representative Brown, T. added as coauthor |
2015-01-13 | House | First Reading: referred to Committee on Local Government |
2015-01-13 | House | Authored by Representative Smith M |