IN HB1258 | 2012 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Enrolled on February 23 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-19 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Specifies that an individual holding a beneficial or ownership interest in an entity is considered the transferee when a transferor makes a transfer subject to the inheritance tax to the entity. Provides that the individual is liable for the same percentage of the inheritance tax as the individual's percentage of beneficial or ownership interest in the entity. Eliminates authority to file a recovery claim against the estate of the recipient's spouse. Eliminates rules of will construction that applied only to decedents dying in 2010. Authorizes foreign wills to be probated after the expiration of the probate deadlines for the same limited purposes for which Indiana wills may be probated after the deadlines. Provides that costs of administration include the fee of a surrogate attorney for purposes of determining the priority of claims when an estate's resources are insufficient to pay all claims. Eliminates the requirement that a declaration designating a standby guardian include the Social Security number of the child or protected person. Specifies that a standby guardian has all of the powers granted by the guardianship statute. Provides that amendments to the trust code apply to trusts created prior to the effective date of the amendment unless certain adverse events would occur because of the application of the amendment. Provides that amendments to the transfer on death (TOD) statute apply to TOD transfers created before the effective date of the amendment. Specifies that a testamentary trust receiving a TOD transfer is considered to have been in existence as of the owner's death if the owner's last will and testament is admitted to probate. Provides that the practice of law by a person who is not an attorney is considered racketeering activity for purposes of the law concerning racketeer influenced and corrupt organizations. Removes authority for a transferring entity to adopt rules concerning TOD transfers in whole or in part by incorporation by references. Removes possible exceptions concerning the rules that apply to a beneficiary designation. Provides that a guardian does not need to be appointed if custodial property is less than $10,000. Makes technical corrections. Provides that a personality does not have rights of publicity if the personality has commercial value solely because the personality has been charged with or convicted of a crime. Provides that: (1) a deceased personality's rights of publicity apply to the personality whether the personality died before, on, or after July 1, 1994 (the original effective date of the rights of publicity law); (2) if the personality died before July 1, 1994, the deceased personality's rights of publicity are considered to have existed on and after the date the personality died; (3) a claim for a violation of a personality's right of publicity may not be asserted unless the alleged act or event of violation occurs within Indiana; and (4) a claim for a violation of the personality's right of publicity may not be asserted under this chapter unless the alleged act or event of violation occurs after June 30, 1994. Repeals rules of trust construction that applied only to decedents dying in 2010. (The introduced version of this bill was prepared by the probate code study commission.)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Various estate administration matters.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-03-09 - House - House - Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the House (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-03-09 - Senate - Senate - Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the Senate (Y: 38 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-23 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-31 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-01-30 - House - House - Amendment 1 (Goodin), failed (Y: 33 N: 62 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-03-19 Signed by the Governor
2012-03-13 Signed by the President Pro Tempore
2012-03-12 Signed by the President of the Senate
2012-03-09 Signed by the Speaker
2012-03-09 Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 357: yeas 38, nays 11
2012-03-09 Senate Rule 86(a) suspended
2012-03-09 Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the House; Roll Call 396: yeas 93, nays 0
2012-03-09 Rules suspended
2012-03-09 Conference committee report 1 : filed in the House
2012-03-01 Senate advisor appointed: Glick
2012-03-01 Senate conferee appointed: Zakas and Broden
2012-03-01 House advisors appointed: McMillin, Eberhart and Dvorak
2012-03-01 House conferees appointed: Foley and DeLaney
2012-03-01 House dissented from Senate amendments
2012-02-23 Returned to the House with amendments
2012-02-23 Third reading: passed; Roll Call 240: yeas 49 and nays 0
2012-02-20 Amendment 1 (Lawson), prevailed; voice vote
2012-02-20 Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2012-02-16 Committee report: do pass, adopted
2012-02-01 First reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary
2012-01-31 Senate sponsors: Senators Zakas, Glick and Broden
2012-01-31 Referred to the Senate
2012-01-31 Third reading: passed; Roll Call 174: yeas 96, nays 0
2012-01-30 Amendment 1 (Goodin), failed; Roll Call 118: yeas 33, nays 62
2012-01-30 Second reading: ordered engrossed
2012-01-27 Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
2012-01-23 Referred to Committee on Ways and Means pursuant to House Rule 127
2012-01-23 Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
2012-01-09 First reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary
2012-01-09 Coauthored by Representatives McMillin and DeLaney
2012-01-09 Authored by Representative Foley

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.in.gov/apps/lsa/session/billwatch/billinfo?year=2012&session=1&request=getBill&doctype=HB&docno=1258
Texthttp://www.in.gov/legislative/bills/2012/IN/IN1258.1.html
Texthttp://www.in.gov/legislative/bills/2012/HB/HB1258.1.html
Texthttp://www.in.gov/legislative/bills/2012/HB/HB1258.2.html
Texthttp://www.in.gov/legislative/bills/2012/EH/EH1258.1.html
Texthttp://www.in.gov/legislative/bills/2012/EH/EH1258.2.html
Texthttp://www.in.gov/legislative/bills/2012/HE/HE1258.1.html
Roll Callhttp://www.in.gov/legislative/bills/2012/PDF/Hrollcal/0118.PDF.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.in.gov/legislative/bills/2012/PDF/Hrollcal/0174.PDF.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.in.gov/legislative/bills/2012/PDF/Srollcal/0240.PDF.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.in.gov/legislative/bills/2012/PDF/Srollcal/0357.PDF.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.in.gov/legislative/bills/2012/PDF/Hrollcal/0396.PDF.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback