IN HB1256 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-19 - Public Law 84
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-19 - Public Law 84
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Juvenile court jurisdiction. Provides that a child who: (1) commits indecent display by a youth; or (2) commits dangerous possession of a firearm or provides a firearm to another child in certain circumstances; has committed a delinquent act subject to the jurisdiction of a juvenile court.
Title
Juvenile court jurisdiction.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-23 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 36 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - Senate - Senate - Amendment #1 (Tallian) failed (Y: 17 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2021-03-16 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 92 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - Senate - Senate - Amendment #1 (Tallian) failed (Y: 17 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2021-03-16 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 92 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-19 | House | Public Law 84 |
2021-04-19 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2021-03-29 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Returned to the House without amendments |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Senator Sandlin added as second sponsor |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 262: yeas 36, nays 12 |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Amendment #1 (Tallian) failed; Roll Call 240: yeas 17, nays 31 |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2021-02-23 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Corrections and Criminal Law |
2021-02-12 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2021-02-11 | House | Senate sponsor: Senator Young M |
2021-02-11 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 109: yeas 92, nays 1 |
2021-02-08 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2021-02-04 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2021-01-14 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Courts and Criminal Code |
2021-01-14 | House | Coauthored by Representative Steuerwald |
2021-01-14 | House | Authored by Representative McNamara |