IN HB1249 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 3 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-08 - First reading: referred to Committee on Corrections & Criminal Law
Pending: Senate Corrections & Criminal Law Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 3 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-08 - First reading: referred to Committee on Corrections & Criminal Law
Pending: Senate Corrections & Criminal Law Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Driving privileges suspensions. Provides that when judgment has been imposed for committing two worksite speed limit violations within one year, an additional penalty of the suspension of the person's driving privileges for 60 days may be imposed by the court imposing the sentence for the second violation. Provides that specialized driving privileges may be granted to the person by the court for the purpose of operating a motor vehicle between the place of employment and residence of the person.
Title
Driving privileges suspensions. Provides that when judgment has been imposed for committing two worksite speed limit violations within one year, an additional penalty of the suspension of the person's driving privileges for 60 days may be imposed by the court imposing the sentence for the second violation. Provides that specialized driving privileges may be granted to the person by the court for the purpose of operating a motor vehicle between the place of employment and residence of the person.
Sponsors
Rep. Charles Moseley [D] | Rep. Edmond Soliday [R] | Sen. Brent Steele [R] | Sen. Jon Ford [R] |
Sen. Karen Tallian [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-02-02 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 95 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-01-27 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-01-27 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-08 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Corrections & Criminal Law |
2016-02-03 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2016-02-02 | House | Senate sponsors: Senators Steele, Ford, Tallian |
2016-02-02 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 146: yeas 95, nays 1 |
2016-02-01 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2016-01-28 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2016-01-25 | House | Representative Soliday added as coauthor |
2016-01-11 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Roads and Transportation |
2016-01-11 | House | Authored by Representative Moseley |