IN HB1247 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on April 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-29 - Public Law 183
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Child care provider notice. Allows the division of family resources (division) to send certain notices to: (1) an applicant for licensure as a child care center, licensure as a child care home, or registration as a child care ministry; and (2) a licensed child care center, a licensed child care home, and a registered child care ministry; by electronic mail instead of by certified mail. Requires: (1) an applicant for licensure as a child care center, licensure as a child care home, or registration as a child care ministry to provide a current and valid electronic mail address to the division in the application; and (2) a licensed child care center, a licensed child care home, and a registered child care ministry to maintain the provided electronic mail address for the duration of the licensure or registration.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Child care provider notice.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-06 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-29HousePublic Law 183
2021-04-29HouseSigned by the Governor
2021-04-28SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2021-04-23SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2021-04-13HouseSigned by the Speaker
2021-04-07SenateReturned to the House without amendments
2021-04-06SenateSenator Randolph added as cosponsor
2021-04-06SenateSenator Young M added as second sponsor
2021-04-06SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 353: yeas 50, nays 0
2021-04-05SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2021-03-29SenateCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2021-02-18SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Family and Children Services
2021-02-03HouseReferred to the Senate
2021-02-02HouseRepresentative Jackson added as coauthor
2021-02-02HouseSenate sponsor: Senator Ford Jon
2021-02-02HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 51: yeas 95, nays 0
2021-02-01HouseRepresentative Olthoff added as coauthor
2021-02-01HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2021-01-28HouseCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2021-01-14HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Family, Children and Human Affairs
2021-01-14HouseCoauthored by Representative DeVon
2021-01-14HouseAuthored by Representative Vermilion

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2021/bills/house/1247/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/5/5/e/c55e0f14/HB1247.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/2/2/5/7225a671/HB1247.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/c/c/2/7cc29898/HB1247.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/4/7/8/84780062/HB1247.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/3/5/d/935db1ae/HB1247.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/8/0/b/b80b2b41/HB1247.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/f/3/1/0f31832f/HB1247.04.ENRS.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/9/c/5/e9c536e0/HB1247.01.INTR.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/8/5/d/b85d0c47/HB1247.01.INTR.CRH001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/b/e/4/1be4e2e6/HB1247.02.COMH.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/7/0/5/0705dc5a/HB1247.02.COMH.FN002.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/4/6/1/746195c5/HB1247.02.COMH.FN003.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/5/e/3/f5e3e612/HB1247.03.COMS.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/4/a/2/64a22880/HB1247.02.COMH.CRS001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/1/4/0/e1405b82/HB1247.03.COMS.FN002.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/c/4/9/ec490ecf/HB1247.03.COMS.FN003.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/0/7/c/607c1e71/HB1247.04.ENRS.FN001.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/9/b/6/a9b6d578/HB1247.01.INTR.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/d/b/2/edb2b28e/HB1247.51_H.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/0/f/3/e0f39f2a/HB1247.02.COMH.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/f/d/a/0fda0c07/HB1247.353_S.pdf

Bill Comments 750

feedback