IN HB1246 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-01-12 - First reading: referred to Committee on Commerce, Energy, Technology and Utilities
Pending: House Commerce, Energy, Technology and Utilities Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-01-12 - First reading: referred to Committee on Commerce, Energy, Technology and Utilities
Pending: House Commerce, Energy, Technology and Utilities Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Abolishes the wireless enhanced 911 advisory board (board) as of July 1, 2010. Transfers responsibility for maintaining and improving a statewide enhanced 911 network from the from the board to the department of homeland security (department). Provides that the amount of the wireless emergency enhanced 911 fee is $0.50 per month for each telephone number assigned to a commercial mobile radio service (CMRS) subscriber whose place of primary use is in Indiana. Provides that fees collected by CMRS providers after June 30, 2010, shall be remitted to the department of state revenue, rather than the board, for deposit in the wireless emergency telephone system fund. Provides that after June 30, 2010, the part of the fees that are: (1) collected by the state and remaining after the required distributions to counties; and (2) deposited into an escrow account by the treasurer of state; shall be used by the department to maintain and improve a statewide enhanced 911 network. Requires a seller of prepaid wireless telecommunications service to collect at the point of sale an enhanced prepaid wireless charge (charge) of $0.25 per retail transaction. Requires the seller to remit the charge to the department of state revenue for deposit in the wireless emergency telephone system fund. Specifies how the charges that are collected and deposited in the fund are to be distributed. Repeals provisions: (1) establishing the board; and (2) providing for the recovery of certain costs incurred by CMRS providers before July 1, 2005, to implement wireless E911. Repeals other provisions made obsolete by the elimination of the board.
Title
Wireless E911 fees.
Sponsors
Rep. Matt Pierce [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-01-12 | First reading: referred to Committee on Commerce, Energy, Technology and Utilities | |
2010-01-12 | Authored by Representative Pierce |
Indiana State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.in.gov/apps/lsa/session/billwatch/billinfo?year=2010&session=1&request=getBill&doctype=HB&docno=1246 |
Text | http://www.in.gov/legislative/bills/2010/IN/IN1246.1.html |