IN HB1245 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 12-4)
Status: Passed on April 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-24 - Public Law 81
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Various higher education matters. Changes the name of Bethel College to Bethel University and Manchester College to Manchester University and removes Saint Joseph's College with regard to the definitions of an "authorizer" of a charter school and an "approved postsecondary educational institution". Makes changes concerning the name of Purdue University Fort Wayne. (Current law references the university as Indiana University-Purdue University Fort Wayne.) Provides that: (1) the commission for higher education (commission) shall provide each high school in Indiana with the names of the students of that high school who have filed for financial aid if the high school has entered into an agreement with the commission; and (2) each Indiana high school shall enter into an agreement to allow the commission to share the information with the Indiana high school. Removes a provision that requires the insurance commissioner to deposit fees collected for certain insurance producer certificates into the insurance education scholarship fund (which is being repealed). Repeals provisions concerning the following: (1) Hoosier scholar award program. (2) Insurance education scholarship fund. (3) Teacher loan repayment program and fund. Repeals provisions that require: (1) the board of trustees of Indiana University to facilitate the development and operation of Indiana University-Purdue University Fort Wayne as a multisystem metropolitan university; and (2) each state educational institution to provide the commission with a report concerning participation in the senior citizen tuition exemption. Repeals provisions concerning the board of trustees of Indiana University and the Fort Wayne Art Institute. Repeals a provision that requires Ivy Tech Community College to enter into a lease with the owners of the Fort Wayne Regional Public Safety Center to further its partnership with certain entities to offer public safety related degree programs. Makes conforming changes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Various higher education matters. Changes the name of Bethel College to Bethel University and Manchester College to Manchester University and removes Saint Joseph's College with regard to the definitions of an "authorizer" of a charter school and an "approved postsecondary educational institution". Makes changes concerning the name of Purdue University Fort Wayne. (Current law references the university as Indiana University-Purdue University Fort Wayne.) Provides that: (1) the commission for higher education (commission) shall provide each high school in Indiana with the names of the students of that high school who have filed for financial aid if the high school has entered into an agreement with the commission; and (2) each Indiana high school shall enter into an agreement to allow the commission to share the information with the Indiana high school. Removes a provision that requires the insurance commissioner to deposit fees collected for certain insurance producer certificates into the insurance education scholarship fund (which is being repealed). Repeals provisions concerning the following: (1) Hoosier scholar award program. (2) Insurance education scholarship fund. (3) Teacher loan repayment program and fund. Repeals provisions that require: (1) the board of trustees of Indiana University to facilitate the development and operation of Indiana University-Purdue University Fort Wayne as a multisystem metropolitan university; and (2) each state educational institution to provide the commission with a report concerning participation in the senior citizen tuition exemption. Repeals provisions concerning the board of trustees of Indiana University and the Fort Wayne Art Institute. Repeals a provision that requires Ivy Tech Community College to enter into a lease with the owners of the Fort Wayne Regional Public Safety Center to further its partnership with certain entities to offer public safety related degree programs. Makes conforming changes.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-04 - House - House - House concurred in Senate amendments (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - House - Third reading (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-16 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-24HousePublic Law 81
2019-04-24HouseSigned by the Governor
2019-04-23SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2019-04-09SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2019-04-08HouseSigned by the Speaker
2019-04-04HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 407: yeas 90, nays 0
2019-04-03HouseMotion to concur filed
2019-03-20SenateReturned to the House with amendments
2019-03-19SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 289: yeas 48, nays 0
2019-03-18SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2019-03-14SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2019-03-07SenateSenator Kruse added as second sponsor
2019-02-27SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Education and Career Development
2019-01-25HouseReferred to the Senate
2019-01-24HouseRepresentatives Hatfield, Cook, Jordan, Behning, Burton, Clere, DeVon, Goodrich, Lucas, Thompson, Smith, V., DeLaney, Klinker added as coauthors
2019-01-24HouseRule 105.1 suspended
2019-01-24HouseSenate sponsor: Senator Raatz
2019-01-24HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 36: yeas 98, nays 0
2019-01-22HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2019-01-17HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2019-01-10HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Education
2019-01-10HouseAuthored by Representative Sullivan

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2019/bills/house/1245/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/8/8/7/0887757f/HB1245.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/d/2/d/fd2d1d57/HB1245.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/b/a/d/abad1ff9/HB1245.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/4/a/b/44ab86a0/HB1245.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/9/0/b/b90bb6aa/HB1245.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/9/6/6/f966e634/HB1245.04.ENRS.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/1/d/a/21dab345/HB1245.01.INTR.03.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/c/9/c/fc9c8278/HB1245.36.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/c/c/7/dcc71729/HB1245.02.COMH.01.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/8/c/3/08c3407b/HB1245.289.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/e/a/3/9ea3d0a7/HB1245.407.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback