IN HB1237 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-3)
Status: Passed on April 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-24 - Public Law 145
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-3)
Status: Passed on April 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-24 - Public Law 145
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Grain buyers and warehouse licensing. Adds and amends various definitions for purposes of the grain buyers and warehouse licensing laws. Amends notice that is required on contracts for the purchase of grain from producers. Allows the director of the grain buyers and warehouse licensing agency (agency) to designate an administrative law judge to act for the director in the administration of the licensing laws. Allows the director of the agency (director) to issue subpoenas and orders to compel production of records. Allows the agency to send license renewal applications electronically. Requires certain applicants to designate a registered agent. Requires the
Title
Grain buyers and warehouse licensing. Adds and amends various definitions for purposes of the grain buyers and warehouse licensing laws. Amends notice that is required on contracts for the purchase of grain from producers. Allows the director of the grain buyers and warehouse licensing agency (agency) to designate an administrative law judge to act for the director in the administration of the licensing laws. Allows the director of the agency (director) to issue subpoenas and orders to compel production of records. Allows the agency to send license renewal applications electronically. Requires certain applicants to designate a registered agent. Requires the
Sponsors
Rep. Donald Lehe [R] | Rep. James Baird [R] | Rep. Melanie Wright [D] | Rep. William Friend [R] |
Sen. Jean Leising [R] | Sen. Philip Boots [R] | Sen. Frank Mrvan [D] | Sen. Lonnie Randolph [D] |
Sen. Dennis Kruse [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-10 - House - House - House concurred in Senate amendments (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-27 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-20 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-09 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-27 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-20 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-09 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-24 | House | Public Law 145 |
2017-04-24 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2017-04-19 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2017-04-10 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 433: yeas 96, nays 0 |
2017-04-06 | House | Motion to concur filed |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Returned to the House with amendments |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Senator Kruse added as cosponsor |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 290: yeas 49, nays 0 |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Amendment #1 (Leising) prevailed; voice vote |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Senators Mrvan and Randolph added as cosponsors |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Senator Boots added as second sponsor |
2017-02-23 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Agriculture |
2017-02-22 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2017-02-21 | House | Senate sponsor: Senator Leising |
2017-02-21 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 174: yeas 97, nays 0 |
2017-02-16 | House | Amendment #1 (Lehe) prevailed; voice vote |
2017-02-16 | House | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2017-02-09 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2017-02-02 | House | Representatives Baird, Wright, Friend added as coauthors |
2017-01-10 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Agriculture and Rural Development |
2017-01-10 | House | Authored by Representative Lehe |