IN HB1237 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-27 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-27 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Amends and codifies various bureau of motor vehicle (BMV) fees and related distributions to conform to BMV practice following the settlement of fee related litigation. Amends various statutes governing the secretary of state's dealer services division to preserve existing authority to impose, collect, and distribute certain fees. Authorizes the BMV to modify a Purple Heart license plate for issuance to an individual who is eligible for both a Purple Heart license plate and a disability placard or license plate. Provides that the photograph on a license or permit must be a digital color photograph, with certain exceptions. Requires the secretary of state to adopt emergency rules concerning the elimination of dealer-wholesale license plates and wholesale dealer licenses. Voids BMV rules rendered obsolete by the codification of fees and distributions. Resolves conflicts among and between various enrolled acts.
Title
Bureau of motor vehicles fees.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-12 - Senate - Senate - Conference Committee Report 1 adopted (Y: 37 N: 8 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-03-12 - House - House - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 adopted (Y: 69 N: 26 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-02-24 - Senate - Senate Floor - (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-02-18 - Senate - Senate Committee on Homeland Security, Transportation, and Veterans Affairs - Roll Call 123703 (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-28 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 65 N: 28 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-01-22 - House - House Committee on Roads and Transportation - Roll Call 123701 (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-12 - House - House - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 adopted (Y: 69 N: 26 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-02-24 - Senate - Senate Floor - (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-02-18 - Senate - Senate Committee on Homeland Security, Transportation, and Veterans Affairs - Roll Call 123703 (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-28 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 65 N: 28 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-01-22 - House - House Committee on Roads and Transportation - Roll Call 123701 (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-27 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2014-03-14 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Joint Rule 20 technical correction adopted by the Senate |
2014-03-13 | House | Joint Rule 20 technical correction adopted by the House |
2014-03-13 | House | Public Law 216 |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Conference Committee Report 1 adopted; Roll Call 400: yeas 37 and nays 8 |
2014-03-12 | House | Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 adopted; Roll Call 450: yeas 69 and nays 26 |
2014-03-11 | House | Representative Smaltz added as conferee |
2014-03-11 | House | Representative Forestal removed as conferee |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Senator Hume added as advisor |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Senator Merritt added as advisor |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Senator Arnold added as conferee |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Senator Wyss added as conferee |
2014-03-04 | House | Representative Thompson added as advisor |
2014-03-04 | House | Representative Forestal added as conferee |
2014-03-04 | House | Representative Soliday added as conferee |
2014-03-04 | House | Representative Macer added as advisor |
2014-03-04 | House | House dissented from Senate Amendments |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Returned to the House with amendments |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Third reading: Passed: Roll Call 226: yeas 47 and nays 0 |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Second reading: engrossed. |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted. |
2014-02-04 | Senate | First Reading: Referred to Homeland Security, Transportation, and Veterans Affairs |
2014-01-29 | House | Senator Arnold added as second sponsor. |
2014-01-28 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2014-01-28 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 89: yeas 65 and nays 29 |
2014-01-28 | House | Senator Wyss added as sponsor. |
2014-01-27 | House | HB 1237 Amendment #1 (Soliday), prevailed. |
2014-01-27 | House | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2014-01-27 | House | Representative T. Brown added as coauthor. |
2014-01-23 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted. |
2014-01-14 | House | First Reading: Referred to Roads and Transportation |
2014-01-13 | House | Authored by Representative Soliday. |