IN HB1237 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 5 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-12 - Senators Randolph and Rogers added as cosponsors
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 5 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-12 - Senators Randolph and Rogers added as cosponsors
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Intrastate transportation regulation.
Title
Intrastate transportation regulation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-02-05 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-12 | Senate | Senators Randolph and Rogers added as cosponsors |
2013-03-11 | Senate | Senator Wyss added as second sponsor |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2013-02-25 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Homeland Security, Transportation and Veterans Affairs |
2013-02-05 | House | Senate sponsor: Senator Charbonneau |
2013-02-05 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2013-02-05 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 77: yeas 98, nays 0 |
2013-02-04 | House | Representatives V. Smith and Harris added as coauthors |
2013-02-04 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2013-01-31 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2013-01-14 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Roads and Transportation |
2013-01-14 | House | Coauthored by Representative Soliday |
2013-01-14 | House | Authored by Representative Slager |