IN HB1235 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-04 - First reading: referred to Committee on Corrections and Criminal Law
Pending: Senate Corrections & Criminal Law Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Judicial officers and public safety officials. Provides that a person commits battery on a public safety official if the offense is committed against a current or former public safety official: (1) while the official is engaged in the official's official duty; or (2) in retaliation for the official having engaged in the official's official duty. (Under current law, a person commits the offense only if the official is acting in the person's official duty.) Exempts a person who retires from judicial office after at least 20 years of service or because of a disability from the payment of the fee for a license to carry a handgun. Permits a former judicial officer to possess and use a handgun in the same locations as a judicial officer, and requires the supreme court to annually issue an identification card to a former judicial officer.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Judicial officers and public safety officials. Provides that a person commits battery on a public safety official if the offense is committed against a current or former public safety official: (1) while the official is engaged in the official's official duty; or (2) in retaliation for the official having engaged in the official's official duty. (Under current law, a person commits the offense only if the official is acting in the person's official duty.) Exempts a person who retires from judicial office after at least 20 years of service or because of a disability from the payment of the fee for a license to carry a handgun. Permits a former judicial officer to possess and use a handgun in the same locations as a judicial officer, and requires the supreme court to annually issue an identification card to a former judicial officer.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-19 - House - Third reading (Y: 92 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-04SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Corrections and Criminal Law
2019-02-20HouseReferred to the Senate
2019-02-19HouseSenate sponsor: Senator Head
2019-02-19HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 216: yeas 92, nays 4
2019-02-18HouseRepresentatives Bartels and Young J added as coauthors
2019-02-18HouseRule 105.1 suspended
2019-02-18HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2019-02-14HouseRepresentative Dvorak added as coauthor
2019-02-14HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2019-01-15HouseRepresentative Lehman added as coauthor
2019-01-10HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Courts and Criminal Code
2019-01-10HouseCoauthored by Representative Torr
2019-01-10HouseAuthored by Representative Cook

Indiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback