IN HB1232 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 25 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-25 - Effective 07/01/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Provides that a permit is not required to remove a logjam or mass of wood debris that has accumulated in a river or stream.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Removal of logjams in floodways.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2010-03-25 Effective 07/01/2010
2010-03-25 Public Law 76
2010-03-17 Signed by the Governor
2010-03-11 Signed by the President of the Senate
2010-03-10 Signed by the President Pro Tempore
2010-03-08 Signed by the Speaker
2010-03-02 House concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 280: Yeas 77, Nays 1
2010-02-22 Senator Hume added as cosponsor
2010-02-22 Returned to the House with amendments
2010-02-22 Third reading: passed; Roll Call 197: Yeas 47 and Nays 3
2010-02-18 Second reading: ordered engrossed
2010-02-16 Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
2010-02-15 Senator Stutzman added as cosponsor
2010-02-08 First reading: referred to Committee on Natural Resources
2010-02-02 Representative Bischoff added as coauthor
2010-02-02 Senate sponsors: Senators Charbonneau and Arnold
2010-02-02 Referred to the Senate
2010-02-02 Third reading: passed; Roll Call 128: Yeas 93, Nays 1
2010-02-01 Second reading: ordered engrossed
2010-01-28 Committee report: do pass, adopted
2010-01-14 Representative Davis added as coauthor
2010-01-11 First reading: referred to Committee on Natural Resources
2010-01-11 Coauthored by Representatives Dembowski and Eberhart
2010-01-11 Authored by Representative Dermody

Indiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback