IN HB1227 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-02-23 - First reading: referred to Committee on Appropriations
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Thirteenth check and $50 increase payment. Provides for a thirteenth check in 2021 for certain members of the: (1) Indiana state teachers' retirement fund; (2) public employees' retirement fund; (3) state excise police, gaming agent, gaming control officer, and conservation enforcement officers' retirement plan; (4) state police pre-1987 benefit system; and (5) state police 1987 benefit system. Provides for a $50 payment to members of the Indiana state teachers' retirement fund and public employees' retirement fund, and to participants of the state excise police, gaming agent, gaming control officer, and conservation enforcement officers' retirement plan.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Thirteenth check and $50 increase payment.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-11 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 92 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-23SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Appropriations
2021-02-12HouseReferred to the Senate
2021-02-11HouseSenate sponsor: Senator Walker G
2021-02-11HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 116: yeas 92, nays 1
2021-02-08HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2021-02-04HouseCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2021-02-01HouseRepresentatives VanNatter, King J, Andrade M added as coauthors
2021-01-28HouseReferred to the Ways and Means pursuant to House Rule 127
2021-01-28HouseCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2021-01-14HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Employment, Labor and Pensions
2021-01-14HouseAuthored by Representative Karickhoff

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2021/bills/house/1227/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/a/4/b/3a4b5227/HB1227.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/e/1/d/4e1d0e66/HB1227.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/d/d/1/0dd1ac79/HB1227.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/b/3/6/0b3600f0/HB1227.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/2/2/9/5229a987/HB1227.03.COMH.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/8/e/1/48e1d31a/HB1227.01.INTR.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/a/2/2/0a2234b7/HB1227.01.INTR.CRH001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/c/a/1/eca1bbde/HB1227.02.COMH.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/5/0/e/650eb882/HB1227.02.COMH.CRH001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/2/8/1/d281fc74/HB1227.03.COMH.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/4/8/2/c4822465/HB1227.03.COMH.FN002.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/3/b/9/93b98ea6/HB1227.03.COMH.FN003.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/f/3/e/1f3e1a6a/HB1227.01.INTR.01.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/7/5/e/275e338c/HB1227.02.COMH.01.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/b/2/b/7b2b4cfb/HB1227.116_H.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback