IN HB1222 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 13 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-25 - Signed by the President Pro Tempore
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 13 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-25 - Signed by the President Pro Tempore
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Provides an adjusted gross income tax credit for an individual who is eligible to claim the federal adoption credit. Establishes the interim committee on adoption to: (1) study how other states provide services under public adoption programs and study legal and regulatory costs associated with foster care and private adoption; (2) make recommendations concerning improving adoption programs; and (3) report the committee's findings and recommendations.
Title
Adoption committee and tax credit.
Sponsors
Rep. Rebecca Kubacki [R] | Rep. Eric Turner [R] | Rep. Karlee Macer [D] | Sen. Lonnie Randolph [D] |
Sen. John Broden [D] | Sen. Michael Delph [R] | Sen. Joseph Zakas [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-03-04 - House - House - Motion to Concur in Senate Amendments (Y: 90 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2014-02-27 - Senate - Senate Floor - (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-18 - Senate - Senate Committee on Tax and Fiscal Policy - Roll Call 122204 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-03 - House - House - Third reading: Passed: (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-01-30 - House - House Floor - (Y: 27 N: 63 NV: 6 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2014-01-27 - House - House Committee on Ways and Means - Roll Call 122202 (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-01-15 - House - House Committee on Family, Children and Human Affairs - Roll Call 122201 (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-27 - Senate - Senate Floor - (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-18 - Senate - Senate Committee on Tax and Fiscal Policy - Roll Call 122204 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-03 - House - House - Third reading: Passed: (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-01-30 - House - House Floor - (Y: 27 N: 63 NV: 6 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2014-01-27 - House - House Committee on Ways and Means - Roll Call 122202 (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-01-15 - House - House Committee on Family, Children and Human Affairs - Roll Call 122201 (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-25 | House | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2014-03-25 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2014-03-13 | House | Public Law 132 |
2014-03-04 | House | Motion to Concur in Senate Amendments: prevailed, Roll Call 396: yeas 90 and nays 2 |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Returned to the House with amendments |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Third reading: Passed: Roll Call 261: yeas 48 and nays 0 |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Senator Zakas added as cosponsor. |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Senator Hershman added third sponsor. |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed. |
2014-02-25 | Senate | HB 1222 Amendment #2 (Miller, Pete), prevailed. |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Senator Delph added as cosponsor. |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Senator Broden added as cosponsor. |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as cosponsor. |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted. |
2014-02-10 | Senate | First Reading: Referred to Tax and Fiscal Policy |
2014-02-03 | House | Senator Charbonneau added as second sponsor. |
2014-02-03 | House | Senator Yoder added as sponsor. |
2014-02-03 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2014-02-03 | House | Third reading: Passed: Roll Call 191: yeas 94 and nays 0 |
2014-01-30 | House | HB 1222 Amendment #2 (Riecken), prevailed. |
2014-01-30 | House | HB 1222 Amendment #1 (Porter), failed. |
2014-01-30 | House | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2014-01-27 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted. |
2014-01-16 | House | Recommitted to Ways and Means pursuant to Rule 127 |
2014-01-16 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted. |
2014-01-15 | House | Representative Turner added as coauthor. |
2014-01-15 | House | Representative Macer added as coauthor. |
2014-01-14 | House | First Reading: Referred to Family, Children and Human Affairs |
2014-01-13 | House | Authored by Representative Kubacki. |