IN HB1221 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-02-16 - Amendment #2 (Austin) motion withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Wholesale pricing of nonalcoholic beverages. With certain exceptions, prohibits a supplier of nonalcoholic packaged beverages (supplier) from discriminating among retailers as to sales price, discounts, allowances, or service charges. Provides that the supplier's discrimination is an unconscionable act under the deceptive consumer sales law. Provides that the consumer protection division of the office of the attorney general may request a court to: (1) enjoin the unconscionable act on behalf of identified retailers; (2) award the state a civil penalty equal to twice the amount of the price difference between two retailers; and (3) award an identified retailer twice the amount of the price difference between two retailers plus the retailer's attorney's fees.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Wholesale pricing of nonalcoholic beverages.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-16 - House - House - Amendment #1 (Porter) failed (Y: 26 N: 66 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2021-02-09 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-16HouseAmendment #2 (Austin) motion withdrawn
2021-02-16HouseAmendment #1 (Porter) failed; Roll Call 129: yeas 26, nays 66
2021-02-16HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2021-02-11HouseCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2021-01-14HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Commerce, Small Business and Economic Development
2021-01-14HouseCoauthored by Representatives Steuerwald, Torr, DeLaney
2021-01-14HouseAuthored by Representative Soliday

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2021/bills/house/1221/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/0/f/2/f0f29fff/HB1221.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/1/6/0/41609fe2/HB1221.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/7/1/1/07113cd6/HB1221.02.COMH.pdf
Amendmenthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/8/b/0/08b0aa1e/HB1221.02.COMH.AMH001.pdf
Amendmenthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/b/3/a/4b3a4960/HB1221.02.COMH.AMH002.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/c/9/c/5c9ca989/HB1221.01.INTR.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/9/c/e/e9ce883c/HB1221.01.INTR.CRH001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/6/6/a/b66ad697/HB1221.02.COMH.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/2/3/0/b230183c/HB1221.02.COMH.FN002.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/6/2/d/b62d619e/HB1221.01.INTR.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/a/3/0/fa30f453/HB1221.129_H.pdf

Bill Comments 750

feedback