IN HB1220 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-3)
Status: Passed on April 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-26 - Public Law 131
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-3)
Status: Passed on April 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-26 - Public Law 131
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
21st century energy policy development task force. Reestablishes the 21st century energy policy development task force (task force), following its expiration on December 2, 2020. Provides that the task force consists of 17 members as follows: (1) Six members of the house of representatives, with four of those members appointed by the speaker, and two appointed by the minority leader. (2) Six members of the senate, with four of those members appointed by the president pro tempore, and two appointed by the minority leader. (3) The utility consumer counselor or the utility consumer counselor's designee. (4) The public finance director or the public finance director's designee. (5) Three members appointed by the governor, each of whom must have specified experience with respect to energy. Provides that: (1) one of the members appointed by the speaker; and (2) one of the members appointed by the president pro tempore; shall serve as co-chairs of the task force. Provides that an individual appointed to serve on the task force at any time before December 2, 2020, under the expired statute governing the task force may be appointed to serve on the task force after December 1, 2020, under these new provisions, at the discretion of the appointing authority. Provides that: (1) all meetings of the task force shall be open to the public in accordance with the state's open door law; and (2) all records of the task force are subject to the requirements of the state's public records law. Sets forth specific issues that the task force must study not later than November 1, 2022. Requires the task force to: (1) develop recommendations for the general assembly and the governor concerning these issues; (2) issue a report setting forth the recommendations developed; and (3) not later than November 1, 2022, submit the report to the executive director of the legislative services agency, the governor, the chair of the utility regulatory commission, and the utility consumer counselor. Provides that these provisions expire July 2, 2023.
Title
21st century energy policy development task force.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-12 - House - House - House concurred in Senate amendments (Y: 55 N: 24 NV: 2 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 66 N: 28 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - House - House - Amendment #1 (Pierce) failed (Y: 30 N: 66 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2021-01-26 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 66 N: 28 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - House - House - Amendment #1 (Pierce) failed (Y: 30 N: 66 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2021-01-26 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-26 | House | Public Law 131 |
2021-04-26 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2021-04-13 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2021-04-12 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 397: yeas 55, nays 24 |
2021-04-06 | House | Motion to concur filed |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Returned to the House with amendments |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as cosponsor |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Senators Houchin, Leising, Baldwin, Doriot, Yoder, Breaux added as cosponsors |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Senator Donato added as third sponsor |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 291: yeas 49, nays 0 |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2021-02-18 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Utilities |
2021-02-03 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2021-02-02 | House | Senate sponsors: Senators Koch and Messmer |
2021-02-02 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 47: yeas 66, nays 28 |
2021-02-01 | House | Amendment #1 (Pierce) failed; Roll Call 21: yeas 30, nays 66 |
2021-02-01 | House | Amendment #2 (Pryor) prevailed; voice vote |
2021-02-01 | House | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2021-01-28 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2021-01-14 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Utilities, Energy and Telecommunications |
2021-01-14 | House | Coauthored by Representative Manning |
2021-01-14 | House | Authored by Representative Soliday |