IN HB1218 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on March 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-30 - Public Law 46
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Locating underground utility infrastructure. Amends the statute concerning the location of underground utility facilities (state 811 law) to provide that for any new or replacement underground facility that an operator installs or causes to be installed after June 30, 2020, the operator shall ensure that: (1) the materials from which the facility is constructed are capable of being detected from above ground level using standard equipment and technologies used by the utility locating industry; or (2) if the materials from which the facility is constructed are not capable of being detected from above ground level using standard locating techniques, the facility is encased by conductive material or is equipped with an electrically conducting wire or other means of locating the facility while it is underground.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Locating underground utility infrastructure.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-04 - House - House - House concurred in Senate amendments (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-22 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-30HousePublic Law 46
2020-03-14HouseSigned by the Governor
2020-03-11SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2020-03-09SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2020-03-05HouseSigned by the Speaker
2020-03-04HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 314: yeas 87, nays 0
2020-03-04HouseMotion to concur filed
2020-02-25SenateReturned to the House with amendments
2020-02-24SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 226: yeas 48, nays 0
2020-02-20SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2020-02-17SenateSenator Randolph added as cosponsor
2020-02-17SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2020-02-05SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Utilities
2020-01-29HouseReferred to the Senate
2020-01-28HouseRepresentatives Soliday, DeVon, Candelaria Reardon added as coauthors
2020-01-28HouseSenate sponsors: Senators Donato and Koch
2020-01-28HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 95: yeas 98, nays 0
2020-01-27HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2020-01-23HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2020-01-13HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Utilities, Energy and Telecommunications
2020-01-13HouseAuthored by Representative Manning

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2020/bills/house/1218/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/b/5/d/2b5d3dee/HB1218.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/6/9/f/969fcd01/HB1218.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/9/7/2/797262ba/HB1218.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/8/7/5/88754439/HB1218.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/a/c/a/9acafc29/HB1218.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/3/c/2/83c2af93/HB1218.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/b/f/5/4bf5cbfc/HB1218.04.ENRS.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/0/d/8/d0d87e21/HB1218.01.INTR.03.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/2/c/f/12cf093e/HB1218.95_H.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/1/c/5/d1c532ef/HB1218.02.COMH.01.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/c/7/b/3c7b6f0c/HB1218.226_S.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/7/3/5/e7355875/HB1218.314_H.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback