IN HB1218 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Passed on March 23 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-23 - Public Law 161
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Franchise employment. Provides that, for purposes of the Indiana franchise law, a franchisor (as defined under federal regulations) is not considered to be an employer or co-employer of: (1) a franchisee (as defined under federal regulations); or (2) an employee of a franchisee; unless the franchisor agrees in writing to assume the role of an employer or co-employer.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Franchise employment. Provides that, for purposes of the Indiana franchise law, a franchisor (as defined under federal regulations) is not considered to be an employer or co-employer of: (1) a franchisee (as defined under federal regulations); or (2) an employee of a franchisee; unless the franchisor agrees in writing to assume the role of an employer or co-employer.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-02-22 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 43 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-11 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-01 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2016-01-26 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-03-23HousePublic Law 161
2016-03-23HouseSigned by the Governor
2016-03-16SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2016-03-01SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2016-02-29HouseSigned by the Speaker
2016-02-23SenateReturned to the House without amendments
2016-02-22SenateSenator Brown L added as cosponsor
2016-02-22SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 195: yeas 43, nays 7
2016-02-18SenateSenator Head added as cosponsor
2016-02-18SenateSenator Merritt added as second sponsor
2016-02-18SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2016-02-15SenateCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2016-02-08SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Commerce & Technology
2016-02-02HouseReferred to the Senate
2016-02-01HouseSenate sponsor: Senator Perfect
2016-02-01HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 103: yeas 93, nays 0
2016-01-28HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2016-01-26HouseRepresentatives Cox, Bauer, Ober added as coauthors
2016-01-26HouseCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2016-01-11HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Employment, Labor and Pensions
2016-01-11HouseAuthored by Representative Harman

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2016/bills/house/1218/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/d/d/b/bddb4504/HB1218.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/8/d/2/e8d256cf/HB1218.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/7/0/0/270051dd/HB1218.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/a/3/3/3a33bc51/HB1218.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/8/1/d/b81dc6b7/HB1218.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/3/1/d/431da218/HB1218.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/2/9/b/a29bd739/HB1218.04.ENRS.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/5/4/c/054c80cd/HB1218.01.INTR.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/8/f/b/f8fb7923/HB1218.103.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/b/8/4/1b84c22f/HB1218.02.COMH.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/4/5/9/3459264a/HB1218.195.pdf

Bill Comments 750

feedback