IN HB1215 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-13 - Public Law 19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Allows a fire protection district to purchase (with the approval of the county council) firefighting apparatus and equipment for the district on an installment conditional sale or mortgage contract running for a period not exceeding 15 years. (Under current law, the 15 year duration for such a contract applies only to a fire protection district with assessed value of $60,000,000 or less.)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Fire protection districts.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-03-19 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-02-21 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-05-13HousePublic Law 19
2013-04-01HouseSigned by the Governor
2013-03-22SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2013-03-21SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2013-03-21HouseSigned by the Speaker
2013-03-19SenateReturned to the House without amendments
2013-03-19SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 288: yeas 49 and nays 0
2013-03-18SenateSenator Wyss added as second sponsor
2013-03-14SenateSenator Arnold added as cosponsor
2013-03-14SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2013-03-12SenateCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2013-02-27SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Homeland Security, Transportation and Veterans Affairs
2013-02-21HouseSenate sponsor: Senator Steele
2013-02-21HouseReferred to the Senate
2013-02-21HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 197: yeas 94, nays 0
2013-02-20HouseAmendment 1 (Goodin), ruled out of order
2013-02-20HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2013-02-18HouseCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2013-02-14HouseRepresentative Ubelhor added as coauthor
2013-01-10HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Local Government
2013-01-10HouseCoauthored by Representatives Pierce and Koch
2013-01-10HouseAuthored by Representative Mayfield

Indiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback