IN HB1212 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on February 21 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-15 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on February 21 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-15 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Defines funeral escort vehicle. Provides that a vehicle utilized in a funeral procession or a funeral escort vehicle may display certain flashing lights in certain colors. Requires a funeral escort vehicle to bear certain markings. Prohibits a funeral escort vehicle from bearing certain markings. Provides that, in order for the vehicles in a funeral procession to have the right-of-way at an intersection, the vehicle heading the funeral procession must display a flashing red light, flashing red and white lights, or a flashing amber light. (Current law allows the vehicle to display alternately flashing red and blue lights.) Provides that certain equipment requirements that apply to a funeral escort vehicle do not apply to an authorized emergency vehicle that is used in a funeral procession or as a funeral escort vehicle. Provides that a person who displays a red and blue lamp upon a vehicle or fails to remove a red and blue lamp from a vehicle under certain circumstances commits a Class C misdemeanor.
Title
Blue lights on vehicles.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-05 - House - House - House concurred in Senate amendments (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-02-21 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 47 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-31 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-02-21 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 47 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-31 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-15 | Signed by the Governor | |
2012-03-08 | Signed by the President of the Senate | |
2012-03-07 | Signed by the President Pro Tempore | |
2012-03-06 | Signed by the Speaker | |
2012-03-05 | House concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 339: yeas 93, nays 0 | |
2012-02-21 | Senator Arnold added as cosponsor | |
2012-02-21 | Senator Buck added as second sponsor | |
2012-02-21 | Returned to the House with amendments | |
2012-02-21 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 227: yeas 47 and nays 3 | |
2012-02-20 | Second reading: ordered engrossed | |
2012-02-16 | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted | |
2012-02-01 | First reading: referred to Committee on Homeland Security, Transportation and Veterans Affairs | |
2012-01-31 | Senate sponsor: Senator Merritt | |
2012-01-31 | Referred to the Senate | |
2012-01-31 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 162: yeas 95, nays 0 | |
2012-01-27 | Representative R. Frye added as coauthor | |
2012-01-27 | Second reading: ordered engrossed | |
2012-01-25 | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted | |
2012-01-09 | First reading: referred to Committee on Veterans Affairs and Public Safety | |
2012-01-09 | Authored by Representative Kirchhofer |